District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Timothy J Kelly
Case #: 1:25-cv-01055
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause05:0706 Judicial Review of Agency Actions
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 1:07 AM EDT
Petitioner
FRANCESCO SANTORA
Respondent
COPYRIGHT CLAIMS BOARD


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
4 4 motion Injunction Mon 04/14 7:43 PM
Ex Parte MOTION for Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order by FRANCESCO SANTORA.(SANTORA, FRANCESCO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: CCB Order Denying Stay,
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Registry of Copyrights,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order TRO,
Att: 4 Statement of Facts Declaration of Facts in Support
order Order on Motion for CM/ECF Password Mon 04/14 1:11 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's3 Motion for CM/ECF Password, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is granted. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/14/2025. (lctjk1)
Related: [-]
utility 1 - Exparte Document - to be used ONLY in conjunction with other selection Mon 04/14 6:44 PM
Ex Parte by FRANCESCO SANTORA, COPYRIGHT CLAIMS BOARD. (SANTORA, FRANCESCO)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
3 3 motion CM/ECF Password Fri 04/11 2:06 PM
MOTION for CM/ECF Password by FRANCESCO SANTORA. (zdp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
2 2 order Standing Order Thu 04/10 2:14 PM
STANDING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/10/2025. (lctjk1)
Related: [-]
service Summons Not Issued Thu 04/10 1:01 PM
SUMMONS Not Issued as to COPYRIGHT CLAIMS BOARD (zdp)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/10 12:59 PM
COMPLAINT against COPYRIGHT CLAIMS BOARD ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number 209380) filed by FRANCESCO SANTORA.(zdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit