Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:25-cv-03185
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Case in other court:New York Western, 1:25-cv-00251
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 8:04 PM PDT
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-50
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Plaintiff
Loren Haxton
Represented By
Brian A. Goldstein
Goldstein Greco, P.C.
contact info
Alexander Joseph Greco
Goldstein Greco, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 10, 2025
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Thu 04/10 2:31 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 1:25-cv-00251. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Thu 04/10 2:33 PM
DIRECT MEMBER CASE OPENED: re: 2741: Opened in California Northern District as 3:25-cv-03185-VC Haxton v. Monsanto Company et al cc: JPMDL (kam2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
5 5 MULTIDISTRICT CONDITIONAL LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER transferring the action to the Northern District of California. Signed by James V. Ingold, Clerk of the Panel on 4/9/2025. (CGJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
4 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Loren Haxton. (Goldstein, Brian)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Goldstein on behalf of Loren Haxton (Goldstein, Brian)
Related: [-]
ATTENTION ALL PARTIES OR INTERVENORS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and/or General Order No. 157 In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Disclosure Statements are to be filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (KM)
Related: [-]
E-Filing Notification: Username and signature do not match Related [+]. Action required: re-file document using same signature and password and file updated proof of service.2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Loren Haxton. Monsanto Company waiver sent on 3/21/2025, answer due 5/20/2025. (Greco, Alexander) (TMK)
Related: [-] fer to Administrative Procedures Guide Section 1-3c
Monday, March 24, 2025
2 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Loren Haxton. Monsanto Company waiver sent on 3/21/2025, answer due 5/20/2025. (Greco, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Case Assigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
Related: [-]
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Pursuant to Section 2.1(A) of the Plan for Alternative Dispute Resolution in the United States District Court for the Western District of New York (the ADR Plan), this case is automatically referred to ADR. To access the ADR Plan and for inquiries regarding the Court's ADR Program please review the Court's[LINK:ADR webpage] and/or contact the Court's ADR Administrator at[LINK:adrprogram@nywd.uscourts.gov] . Prior to the Local Rule 16 scheduling conference, counsel and unrepresented parties shall review the [LINK:ADR Plan] and confer with each other regarding ADR for this case. Unless the parties agree to a different intervention, it is presumed they will participate in mediation. The parties shall be prepared to report on the outcome of their ADR discussion at the scheduling conference, as the initial Scheduling Order for this case will establish ADR deadlines in accordance with the ADR Plan. (TMK)
Related: [-]
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (TMK)
Related: [-]
Original Summons Not Submitted (TMK)
Related: [-]
Notified Multi-District Litigation Panel of potential tag-along case. (TMK)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT against John Does 1-50, Monsanto Company $ 405 receipt number ANYWDC-5436311, filed by Loren Haxton.(Goldstein, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet