California Northern District Court
Judge:Donna M Ryu
Case #: 4:25-cv-03168
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 2:55 AM PDT
Defendant
Facebook Inc.
Defendant
Instagram
Defendant
Meta Platforms Inc.
Plaintiff
Estela Elizabeth Jeffcoat
529 6th Ave South # B3
Brookings, SD 57006


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 04/10 1:30 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/23/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (pjf, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Thu 04/10 1:26 PM
Proposed Summons. (pjf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 04/10 1:21 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Estela Elizabeth Jeffcoat. (pjf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/10 1:17 PM
COMPLAINT against Facebook Inc., Instagram, Meta Platforms Inc.. Filed by Estela Elizabeth Jeffcoat. Consent/Declination due by 4/22/2025.(pjf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Envelope