Washington Western District Court
Judge:John H Chun
Case #: 2:25-cv-00609
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 2:50 AM PDT
Defendant
Stephan Illa
Plaintiff
Donte Jamal McClellon
06316510 PIONEER FELLOWSHIP HOUSE 220 11TH AVE
SEATTLE, WA 98122


Docket last updated: 04/14/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
utility Motions Referred Mon 04/14 10:25 AM
MOTION REFERRED to Judge S. Kate Vaughan:2 SEALED MOTION to Seal IFP Application. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned to Judge Fri 04/11 10:07 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge John H. Chun. Judge Lauren King no longer assigned to the case. (AVC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
4 4 misc Letter Thu 04/10 3:28 PM
LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. Mailed to Plaintiff via USPS. (AVC)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
2 2 motion Sealed Motion Thu 04/10 2:26 PM
SEALED MOTION to Seal IFP Application; re1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge S. Kate Vaughan ; by Plaintiff Donte Jamal McClellon. Noting Date 5/1/2025, (AVC)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 04/10 12:56 PM
SEALED MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge S. Kate Vaughan filed by Donte McClellon.(AVC) Modified on 4/10/2025 to seal Motion for IFP as noted by filer as filed under seal (CDA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PROPOSED Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 PROPOSED Application for Court-Appointed Counsel,
Att: 4 PROPOSED Motion for Court Service of Complaint,
Att: 5 Summons