Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Clifton L Corker
Referred: Christopher H Steger
Case #: 4:25-cv-00015
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Commencement of Social Security Action Tue 04/15 12:49 PM
NOTICE of Commencement of Social Security Action re1 SSA COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (LCK)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/15 12:48 PM
ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Before the Court is Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis [Doc. 2]. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's application is GRANTED. Plaintiff may proceed without prepayment of fees or costs. The Clerk's office is directed to enter the Notice of Commencement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 4/15/2025. (LCK)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/14 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Antolic Gross on behalf of Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (Gross, Nicole)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 04/14 10:59 AM
District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (AFW)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
2 2 motion In Forma Pauperis (Proceed) Fri 04/11 11:40 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cherri L. Taylor. (Atkins, Julie)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Complaint SSA Fri 04/11 11:39 AM
SSA COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, filed by Cherri L. Taylor.(Atkins, Julie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Notice of Unfavorable Decision,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet