New Jersey District Court
Judge:Zahid N Quraishi
Referred: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Case #: 3:25-cv-02632
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal--Other Contract
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2025
Case in other court:SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, OCEAN COUNTY, OCN L 684 25
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 3:09 PM EDT
Defendant
INTERNATIONAL CONNECTORS AND CABLE CORPORATION
Represented By
THOMAS PASCHOS
Thomas Paschos & Associates, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
UNBEATABLESALE.COM, INC.


Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
6 6 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 04/23 1:25 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2025 at 11:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 4/23/2025. (jem)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/17 10:26 AM
Set Deadlines as to5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 5/19/2025 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/16 11:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ICC.(PASCHOS, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Tue 04/15 1:37 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against UNBEATABLESALE.COM, INC. by ICC.(PASCHOS, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Mon 04/14 2:20 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ICC. (PASCHOS, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Fillable PDF Mon 04/14 8:53 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Please email a flattened version to ecfhelp@njd.uscourts.gov for replacement on the docket. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
2 2 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 04/11 9:17 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by ICC. (PASCHOS, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 04/11 2:30 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by INTERNATIONAL CONNECTORS AND CABLE CORPORATION from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, case number OCN-L-684-25. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number CNJDC-16167548), filed by INTERNATIONAL CONNECTORS AND CABLE CORPORATION.(PASCHOS, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
qc QC - Lack of Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/11 3:39 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at[LINK:www.njd.uscourts.gov] for a form and filing instructions. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 04/11 3:39 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 04/11 4:43 PM
Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mlh)
Related: [-]