Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 1:25-bk-10509
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Texas Auto and Truck, Inc., Debtor
8245 S US Highway 183
Lockhart, TX 78644-2781
Represented By
Todd Brice Headden
Hayward PLLC
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 34 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/15 4:33 PM
Amended Certificate of Service filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Texas Auto and Truck, Inc.. (Headden, Todd) Related [+]
Related: [-] 10 Notice of Hearing filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Texas Auto and Truck, Inc.. (Headden, Todd) (Related Document(s):9 Motion for Authority to Pay Certain Pre-Petition Claims of Critical Vendors and Contractors filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Texas Auto and Truck, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Proposed Order)),12 Exhibit Index and Witness List for Hearing on April 16, 2025 at 1:00 PM filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Texas Auto and Truck, Inc.. (Headden, Todd) (Related Document(s):5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Texas Auto and Truck, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order),6 Motion to Jointly Administer filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Texas Auto and Truck, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),7 Motion for Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Wages and Other Employee Benefit Claims filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Texas Auto and Truck, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A- Payroll Projections # 2 Proposed Order),9 Motion for Authority to Pay Certain Pre-Petition Claims of Critical Vendors and Contractors filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Texas Auto and Truck, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Proposed Order))
13 13 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Tue 04/15 3:48 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Michael Flume for Creditor PlainsCapital Bank. (Flume, Michael)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Exhibit Index and Witness List Tue 04/15 2:34 PM
Exhibit Index and Witness List for Hearing on April 16, 2025 at 1:00 PM filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Texas Auto and Truck, Inc.. (Headden, Todd) Related [+]
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Texas Auto and Truck, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order),6 Motion to Jointly Administer filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Texas Auto and Truck, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),7 Motion for Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Wages and Other Employee Benefit Claims filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Texas Auto and Truck, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A- Payroll Projections # 2 Proposed Order),9 Motion for Authority to Pay Certain Pre-Petition Claims of Critical Vendors and Contractors filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Texas Auto and Truck, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Proposed Order)
11 11 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Tue 04/15 2:11 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Diane W. Sanders for Creditor Caldwell CAD. (Sanders, Diane)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Notice of Hearing Tue 04/15 12:57 PM
Notice of Hearing filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Texas Auto and Truck, Inc.. (Headden, Todd) Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Authority to Pay Certain Pre-Petition Claims of Critical Vendors and Contractors filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Texas Auto and Truck, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Proposed Order)
9 9 motion ~Motion (Generic) Tue 04/15 12:20 PM
Motion for Authority to Pay Certain Pre-Petition Claims of Critical Vendors and Contractors filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Texas Auto and Truck, Inc.(Headden, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Proposed Order
8 8 misc Notice of Hearing Tue 04/15 9:00 AM
Notice of Hearing filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Texas Auto and Truck, Inc.. (Headden, Todd) Related [+]
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Texas Auto and Truck, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order),6 Motion to Jointly Administer filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Texas Auto and Truck, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),7 Motion for Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Wages and Other Employee Benefit Claims filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Texas Auto and Truck, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A- Payroll Projections # 2 Proposed Order)
court Hearing (NO FORM) Tue 04/15 10:27 AM
EXPEDITED INTERIM Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following : Related [+]
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Texas Auto and Truck, Inc. Hearing Scheduled For 4/16/2025 at 01:00 PM at https://www.zoomgov.com/my/bradley.txwb via Zoom or Meeting ID: 160 1114 1085 ...COUNSEL FOR MOVANT IS RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTICE OF HEARING. NOTICE SHOULD INCLUDE ZOOM ADDRESS AND MEETING ID NUMBER. (Farrar, Ronda
court Hearing (NO FORM) Tue 04/15 10:29 AM
EXPEDITED Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following : Related [+]
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Jointly Administer filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Texas Auto and Truck, Inc.,7 Motion for Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Wages and Other Employee Benefit Claims filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Texas Auto and Truck, Inc. Hearing Scheduled For 4/16/2025 at 01:00 PM at https://www.zoomgov.com/my/bradley.txwb via Zoom or Meeting ID: 160 1114 1085 ...COUNSEL FOR MOVANT IS RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTICE OF HEARING. NOTICE SHOULD INCLUDE ZOOM ADDRESS AND MEETING ID NUMBER. (Farrar, Ronda
court Hearing (NO FORM) Tue 04/15 12:43 PM
EXPEDITED Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following : Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Authority to Pay Certain Pre-Petition Claims of Critical Vendors and Contractors filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Texas Auto and Truck, Inc. Hearing Scheduled For 4/16/2025 at 01:00 PM at https://www.zoomgov.com/my/bradley.txwb via Zoom or Meeting ID: 160 1114 1085 ...COUNSEL FOR MOVANT IS RESPONSIBLE FOR NOTICE OF HEARING. NOTICE SHOULD INCLUDE ZOOM ADDRESS AND MEETING ID NUMBER. (Farrar, Ronda
Monday, April 14, 2025
7 7 motion ~Motion (Generic) Mon 04/14 11:01 PM
Motion for Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Wages and Other Employee Benefit Claims filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Texas Auto and Truck, Inc.(Headden, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex. A- Payroll Projections
Att: 2 Proposed Order
6 6 motion Consolidate or Jointly Administer Cases Mon 04/14 10:09 PM
Motion to Jointly Administer filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Texas Auto and Truck, Inc.(Headden, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
5 5 motion Use Cash Collateral Mon 04/14 2:16 PM
Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Texas Auto and Truck, Inc.(Headden, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Proposed Order
4 4 court Request for Notice-All Parties/Creditors (PDF) Mon 04/14 8:59 AM
Request for Notice-All Parties/Creditors Related [+] (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-] 3 Order Reassigning Case. Judge Shad Robinson terminated from the case. Judge Christopher G Bradley assigned to case. (Order entered on 4/14/2025)
3 3 order BK-Reassigning Case (PDF) Mon 04/14 8:57 AM
Order Reassigning Case. Judge Shad Robinson terminated from the case. Judge Christopher G Bradley assigned to case. (Order entered on 4/14/2025) (Boyd, Laurie)
Related: [-]
trustee Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (no PDF) Mon 04/14 9:14 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (no PDF) Filed by UST Shane P. Tobin (Tobin, Shane)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
2 2 misc Declaration for Electronic Filing (Restricted Document) Fri 04/11 3:38 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing Related [+] filed by Todd Brice Headden for Debtor Texas Auto and Truck, Inc.. (Headden, Todd)
Related: [-] stricted Document1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 (Non-Individual) Subchapter V With Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1738, ) Filed By Texas Auto and Truck, Inc.. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 04/18/2025 Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 07/10/2025.
1 1 100 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 Fri 04/11 3:38 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 (Non-Individual) Subchapter V With Schedules, Without Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1738, ) Filed By Texas Auto and Truck, Inc.. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 04/18/2025 Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 07/10/2025. (Headden, Todd)
Related: [-]
crditcrd ICC-Fee Paid Fri 04/11 3:39 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 11([LINK 25-10509 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00), Amount $1738.00, Receipt A25269418 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1