Utah District Court
Judge:Ann Marie Mciff Allen
Case #: 2:25-cv-00284
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:2201 Injunction
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 2:40 AM MDT
Defendant
Derek Brown
Defendant
John Pike
Plaintiff
Novartis Pharmaceuticals
Represented By
Kade N. Olsen
Parr Brown Gee & Loveless
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued Electronically Mon 04/14 10:02 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to John Pike. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Electronically Mon 04/14 10:02 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Derek Brown. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Mon 04/14 8:59 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL - Judge Dale A. Kimball recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Ann Marie McIff Allen for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 4/14/2025. (eat)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice PHV Requirements Mon 04/14 7:59 AM
NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance Pro Hac Vice mailed to attorney Susan Cook, Jessica L. Ellsworth, Alexander V. Sverdlov, Marlan Golden, Jacob T. Young for Novartis Pharmaceuticals. (sg)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 04/14 7:54 AM
Judge Dale A. Kimball added. Case number will now read 2:25-cv-00284-DAK. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (sg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
4 4 motion Preliminary Injunction Fri 04/11 9:05 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Novartis Pharmaceuticals.(Olsen, Kade)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - NVS Policy,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - McCrudden Declaration
3 3 misc Rule 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Atty) Fri 04/11 8:07 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Novartis Pharmaceuticals identifying Novartis Finance Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Olsen, Kade)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request Summons Fri 04/11 8:03 PM
Requested Summons as to Derek Brown, John Pike.(Olsen, Kade)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit - Proposed Pike Summons
1 1 44 pgs cmp Complaint (Atty) Fri 04/11 7:52 PM
COMPLAINT against Derek Brown, John Pike (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5392938) filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals. (Olsen, Kade)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet