New York Southern District Court
Judge:P Kevin Castel
Case #: 1:25-cv-03084
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 12:28 AM EDT
ADR Provider
MICHAEL N SLANE
202 West 24th Street 20th Floor
New York, NY 10011
Represented By
Michael N. David
Michael N. David
contact info
Defendant
John Doe Officers
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007
Defendant
THE CITY OF NEW YORK
THE CITY OF NEW YORK 100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007
Defendant
The New York City Department of Corrections
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007


Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 04/25 3:50 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michael N. David to RE-FILE Document No. 6 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the Request for Issuance of Summons cannot be issued for the party requested because it does not identify the party subject to service. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 4(a)(1)(A) and FRCP Rule 4(a)(1)(B) : a summons must name the parties and be directed to the defendant. Once the party has been identified, the filing party may request a summons at that time;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 04/24 11:16 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE CITY OF NEW YORK,THE NEW YORKCITY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, re:5 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Slane..(David, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
5 5 cmp Complaint Thu 04/17 12:45 AM
COMPLAINT against City Of New York, John Doe Officers, The New York City Department of Corrections. Document filed by Michael Slane..(David, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 04/16 11:18 AM
ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/3/2025 at 10:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. The call-in information for all teleconferences is: Dial-in: 1-855-244-8681 Access Code: 2305 810 3970 #. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/16/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Wed 04/16 11:50 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michael N. David to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
3 3 cmp Complaint Tue 04/15 2:33 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Document filed by Michael Slane..(David, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/15 2:24 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(David, Michael)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Tue 04/15 10:19 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael N. David. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: MICHAEL N SLANE, THE CITY OF NEW YORK. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; middle initial was removed. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/15 10:21 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Michael N. David. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Tue 04/15 10:22 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael N. David. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 440 (Civil Rights: Other); Dollar Demand Blank. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 550 (Prisoner: Civil Rights); the Dollar Demand has been modified to 2,000,000. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Tue 04/15 10:23 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michael N. David to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 04/15 10:25 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 04/15 10:26 AM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 04/15 10:26 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/14 11:56 PM
COMPLAINT against MICHAEL N SLANE. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30930346)Document filed by MICHAEL N SLANE..(David, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET,
Att: 2 Exhibit Rule 7A