Maine Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Peter G Cary
Case #: 1:25-bk-10064
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Francis Trust LLC
43 Southside Rd
New Harbor, ME 04554-4701
Represented By
Tanya Sambatakos, Esq.
Molleur Law Office
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee
537 Congress Street, Suite 300
Portland, ME 04101


Docket last updated: 18 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
29 29 audio Tue 04/29 11:12 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/29/2025 8:59:54 AM ]. File Size [ 2782 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:07:44 ]. (courtaudio)
Related: [-]
28 28 court Minutes of Proceedings Tue 04/29 9:51 AM
Minute Entry: Appearances: Tanya Sambatakos, Esq., Jeffrey T. Piampiano, Esq., Jennifer H. Pincus, Esq., Joan Marie Egdall, Esq.. Related [+]. Motion GRANTED; Order to enter. (mep)
Related: [-] 19 Debtor's Motion to Use Cash Collateral
Monday, April 28, 2025
27 27 misc Schedules and Statements Mon 04/28 4:02 PM
Schedules and Statements Filed by Francis Trust LLC. (Sambatakos, Tanya)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Amended Document Mon 04/28 2:24 PM
Amended Exhibit B - Budget. Filed by Francis Trust LLC Related [+]. (Sambatakos, Tanya)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Francis Trust LLC
25 25 answer Objection Mon 04/28 11:58 AM
Objection to Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Stormfield SPV I, LLC Related [+]. (Egdall, Joan)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Francis Trust LLC
24 24 misc Proposed Order Mon 04/28 10:25 AM
Proposed Order Filed by Francis Trust LLC Related [+]. (Sambatakos, Tanya)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Francis Trust LLC
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
23 23 misc Certificate of Service Wed 04/23 3:31 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. (Hayden, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Francis Trust LLC,21 Hearing (Bk) filed by Debtor Francis Trust LLC
22 22 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 04/23 3:28 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with Certificate of Service by Joan Marie Egdall Esq. Filed by on behalf of Stormfield SPV I, LLC. (Egdall, Joan)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Hearing Set Wed 04/23 2:21 PM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Francis Trust LLC Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/29/2025 at 09:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom, Portland. Objections due by 4/28/2025. (Sambatakos, Tanya)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Francis Trust LLC
20 20 order Order re: Request for Expedited hearing Wed 04/23 1:57 PM
Order re: Request for Expedited hearing. The request for an expedited hearing to consider the relief sought in the Motion to Use Cash Collateral is hereby GRANTED. Movant is directed to promptly file and serve a notice of hearing scheduling the hearing for April 29, 2025 at 9:00 a.m. at Bankruptcy Courtroom, Portland. The matter will not appear on the court calendar until the notice of hearing is filed. A certificate evidencing service in accordance with local rules must be filed prior to the hearing. /s/ Peter G. Cary. Related [+] (mnd)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Francis Trust LLC
19 19 6 pgs motion Use Cash Collateral Wed 04/23 9:46 AM
Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Request for Expedited Determination. Filed by Francis Trust LLC. (Sambatakos, Tanya)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Appraisals
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Projected Budget
Att: 3 Exhibit C - UCC-1 Financing Statement
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Friday, April 18, 2025
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors**ADI** Sat 04/19 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Related [+]. Notice Date 04/18/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Thursday, April 17, 2025
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document**ADI** Fri 04/18 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 04/17/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order Setting Status Conference
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document**ADI** Fri 04/18 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 04/17/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order to Comply
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
15 15 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Wed 04/16 11:24 AM
Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/13/2025 at 11:00 AM by Telephone. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/14/2025. Governmental units have 180 days from date of filing of the case or the date of conversion to file a proof of claim. Proofs of Claims for all other creditors are due by 8/11/2025. (mnd)
Related: [-]
14 14 trustee Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee Wed 04/16 9:52 AM
Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee . Trustee Jeffrey T. Piampiano, Esq. assigned to the case. 341 Meeting Date: May 13, 2025. 341 Meeting Time: 11:00 a.m.. Location: Telephonic. Filed by Office of U.S. Trustee. (Pincus, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
13 13 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 04/15 4:27 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jennifer H. Pincus Esq. Filed by on behalf of Office of U.S. Trustee. (Pincus, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 04/15 4:26 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Stephen G. Morrell Esq. Filed by on behalf of Office of U.S. Trustee. (Morrell, Stephen)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/15 1:33 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. (Sambatakos, Tanya)
Related: [-] 8 Chapter 11 First Day Motion filed by Debtor Francis Trust LLC
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/15 1:30 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. (Sambatakos, Tanya)
Related: [-] 6 Chapter 11 First Day Motion filed by Debtor Francis Trust LLC
9 9 1 pgs order Order Setting Status Conference Tue 04/15 12:49 PM
Order Setting Status Conference. Status hearing to be held on 6/3/2025 at 09:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom, Portland. Pre-Status Report Due By 5/20/2025. (mnd)
Related: [-]
8 8 5 pgs motion Chapter 11 First Day Motions Tue 04/15 12:42 PM
Chapter 11 First Day Motion For Application to Employ Peter Christine of Drum and Drum Real Estate as Real Estate broker for Debtor Filed by Francis Trust LLC. (Sambatakos, Tanya)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Exclusive Right to Sell Listing Agreement
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Signed Statement
Att: 3 Proposed Order
7 7 1 pgs order Order to Comply Tue 04/15 12:39 PM
Order to Comply Requiring the Filing of Missing Documents and/or Information and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case. Incomplete Filings due by 4/29/2025. (mnd)
Related: [-]
6 6 7 pgs motion Chapter 11 First Day Motions Tue 04/15 10:58 AM
Chapter 11 First Day Motion For Application to Employ Tanya Sambatakos as Attorney for Debtor Filed by Francis Trust LLC. (Sambatakos, Tanya)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Signed Statement
Att: 2 Proposed Order
5 5 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Tue 04/15 10:24 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Francis Trust LLC. (Sambatakos, Tanya)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Document Tue 04/15 10:15 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Francis Trust LLC. (Sambatakos, Tanya)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Tax Documents Tue 04/15 10:14 AM
Tax Documents for the Year for 2024 Filed by Francis Trust LLC. (Sambatakos, Tanya)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Document Tue 04/15 10:12 AM
Corporate Authorization Filed by Francis Trust LLC. (Sambatakos, Tanya)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)**OPEN BK CASE** Tue 04/15 9:57 AM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual . Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Francis Trust LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 07/14/2025. (Sambatakos, Tanya)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card**ADI** Tue 04/15 10:13 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-10064 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A5031185. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1