New York Southern District Court
Judge:J Paul Oetken
Case #: 1:25-cv-03140
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 16, 2025 2:01 AM EDT
Defendant
Caba Design Corp.
Plaintiff
James Murphy
New York, NY 10003
Represented By
Michael A. LaBollita
Gottlieb & Associates
contact info
Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb
Jeffrey M. Gottlieb, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 15 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 04/17 10:08 AM
ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear telephonically for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on July 30, 2025 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel should call (855) 244-8681 at the scheduled time. The attendee ID number is 23128287066. Counsel who appear at the pretrial conference must be authorized to negotiate terms of settlement. Members of the public may join but are instructed to place their phones on mute. Initial Conference set for 7/30/2025 at 03:00 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/16/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 04/16 10:14 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Caba Design Corp...(jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 04/16 10:07 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 04/16 10:12 AM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 04/16 10:13 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Wed 04/16 10:14 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael A. LaBollita. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/15 11:22 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb on behalf of James Murphy..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/15 11:13 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Caba Design Corp., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by James Murphy..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/15 11:06 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/15 11:06 PM
COMPLAINT against Caba Design Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30937013)Document filed by James Murphy..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]