California Northern District Court
Judge:Lisa J Cisneros
Case #: 3:25-cv-03389
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Case in other court:Contra Costa County Superior Court, C25-00772
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 16, 2025 4:09 PM PDT
Defendant
SAS Retail Services, LLC
Represented By
Nolan Shields McCready
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Roberta Nations


Docket last updated: 79 minutes ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
8 8 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 04/17 4:28 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2025 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 04/17 11:15 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/1/2025. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
6 6 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 04/16 4:18 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by SAS Retail Services, LLC . (McCready, Nolan)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Certificate/Proof of Service Wed 04/16 3:50 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAS Retail Services, LLC re: Notice to State Court and Adverse Parties of Removal to Federal Court (McCready, Nolan)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Relate Case Wed 04/16 3:27 PM
MOTION to Relate Case filed by SAS Retail Services, LLC. (McCready, Nolan)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 04/16 3:22 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by SAS Retail Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Daymon Worldwide Inc. for SAS Retail Services, LLC. re1 Notice of Removal, (McCready, Nolan)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 04/16 3:20 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by SAS Retail Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Daymon Worldwide Inc. for SAS Retail Services, LLC. re1 Notice of Removal, (McCready, Nolan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 04/16 3:10 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Contra Costa County Superior Court. Their case number is C25-00772. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-20574921). Filed by SAS Retail Services, LLC.(McCready, Nolan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Declaration of Robert Murray,
Att: 3 Declaration of Janelle Lowe
utility Electronic Filing Error Wed 04/16 3:50 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Please refile Civil Cover Sheet. Use December 2024 Form which can be downloaded from https://cand.uscourts.gov/. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetPlease re-file in its entirety. Re:1 Notice of Removal, filed by SAS Retail Services, LLC (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
respoth Answer to Removal Complaint Thu 04/17 4:24 PM
Answer to Removed Complaint (See Doc No.1 -exhibit E) by SAS Retail Services, LLC. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]