Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Nicholas W Whittenburg
Case #: 1:25-bk-10943
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025

Debtor
Locals Only Gifts, LLC
10 Frazier Ave
Chattanooga, TN 37405-3931
Represented By
Amanda M. Stofan
Farinash & Stofan
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Historic U.S. Courthouse 31 E. Eleventh Street Fourth Floor
Chattanooga, TN 37402


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 12:02 PM EDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
37 37 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/25 3:49 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Amanda M. Stofan on behalf of Debtor Locals Only Gifts, LLC Related [+]. (Stofan, Amanda)
Related: [-] 28 Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket Thu 04/24 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 21. Notice Date 04/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Order Granting Motion Entry of Order Authorizin Maintenance and Use of Existing Bank Accounts and Cash Management System (Related Doc10 ) (dlt)
35 35 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket Thu 04/24 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 21. Notice Date 04/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order Granting Motion for Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Wages and Salaries and Other Employee Obligations (Related Doc9 ) (dlt)
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket Thu 04/24 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 21. Notice Date 04/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Order Granting Motion To Use Cash Collateral on an Interim Basis and setting Final Hearing for May 22, 2025 at 9:00 in Courtroom A Chattanooga (Related Doc11 ) (dlt)
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket Thu 04/24 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 21. Notice Date 04/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Order and Notice of Small Business Subchapter V Status Conference. Status Hearing scheduled 5/22/2025 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN. Pre-Status Conference Report Due By 5/15/2025. (dlt)
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket Thu 04/24 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 21. Notice Date 04/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Order Granting Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) (Related Doc8 ) (dlt)
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket Thu 04/24 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 24. Notice Date 04/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/16/2025 at 09:00 AM by telephone: 866-808-0545, passcode 6401636 (Ch 11 cases in Chattanooga / Winchester). Proof of Claim due by 6/25/2025. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee. filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
30 30 misc Declaration Tue 04/22 1:12 PM
Declaration Filed by Amanda M. Stofan on behalf of Debtor Locals Only Gifts, LLC Related [+]. (Stofan, Amanda)
Related: [-] 13 Application to Employ
Monday, April 21, 2025
29 29 court Hearing Set (BK) Mon 04/21 3:44 PM
Final Hearing Set Related [+] Hearing scheduled 5/22/2025 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN. (dlt)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Amanda M. Stofan on behalf of Debtor Locals Only Gifts, LLC Hearing scheduled 4/21/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Stofan, Amanda) (dlt). filed by Debtor Locals Only Gifts, LLC
28 28 4 pgs order Use Cash Collateral Mon 04/21 3:41 PM
Order Granting Motion To Use Cash Collateral on an Interim Basis and setting Final Hearing for May 22, 2025 at 9:00 in Courtroom A Chattanooga Related [+] (dlt)
Related: [-] 11
27 27 5 pgs order Order to Set Subchapter V Status Conference Mon 04/21 12:30 PM
Order and Notice of Small Business Subchapter V Status Conference. Status Hearing scheduled 5/22/2025 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN. Pre-Status Conference Report Due By 5/15/2025. (dlt)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Continuation of Utility Service Mon 04/21 12:08 PM
Order Granting Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) Related [+] (dlt)
Related: [-] 8
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Generic Motion Mon 04/21 12:06 PM
Order Granting Motion Entry of Order Authorizin Maintenance and Use of Existing Bank Accounts and Cash Management System Related [+] (dlt)
Related: [-] 10
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Generic Motion Mon 04/21 12:04 PM
Order Granting Motion for Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Wages and Salaries and Other Employee Obligations Related [+] (dlt)
Related: [-] 9
23 23 court Hearing Held/Continued (BK) Mon 04/21 10:17 AM
Hearing Held/Continued Related [+] Motion granted on an interim basis; final hearing scheduled 05/22/2025 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN. Replacement order to be submitted. (sal)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Locals Only Gifts, LLC
22 22 court Hearing Held (BK) Mon 04/21 10:16 AM
Hearing Held Related [+] Motion granted. (sal)
Related: [-] 10 Miscellaneous Motion filed by Locals Only Gifts, LLC
21 21 court Hearing Held (BK) Mon 04/21 10:15 AM
Hearing Held Related [+] Motion granted. (sal)
Related: [-] 9 Miscellaneous Motion filed by Locals Only Gifts, LLC
20 20 court Hearing Held (BK) Mon 04/21 10:15 AM
Hearing Held Related [+] Motion granted. (sal)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service filed by Locals Only Gifts, LLC
19 19 misc Tax Return/Documents Mon 04/21 9:36 AM
Tax Return/Documents for the Year 2023 Filed by Amanda M. Stofan on behalf of Debtor Locals Only Gifts, LLC. (Stofan, Amanda)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Mon 04/21 9:02 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Amanda M. Stofan on behalf of Debtor Locals Only Gifts, LLC Related [+]. (Stofan, Amanda)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service,9 Miscellaneous Motion,10 Miscellaneous Motion,11 Motion to Use Cash Collateral,12 Motion to Extend or Shorten Time
17 17 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12 Mon 04/21 7:48 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/16/2025 at 09:00 AM by telephone: 866-808-0545, passcode 6401636 (Ch 11 cases in Chattanooga / Winchester). Proof of Claim due by 6/25/2025. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee. (Holesinger, David)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 20, 2025
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket Mon 04/21 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 21. Notice Date 04/20/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order Granting Motion to Shorten Time for emergency hearing on first day motions (Related Doc12 ) (dlt)
Friday, April 18, 2025
15 15 trustee Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee Fri 04/18 10:01 PM
Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee Aaron Spencer . M. Aaron Spencer added to the case.. Filed by David Holesinger on behalf of U.S. Trustee United States Trustee. (Holesinger, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
14 14 order Acting on Motion to Extend or Shorten Time Fri 04/18 3:00 PM
Order Granting Motion to Shorten Time for emergency hearing on first day motions Related [+] (dlt)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, April 17, 2025
13 13 8 pgs motion Employ Thu 04/17 5:53 PM
Application to Employ Amanda M. Stofan and Farinash & Stofan as Attorney for Debtor Filed by Amanda M. Stofan on behalf of Debtor Locals Only Gifts, LLC Objections due by 05/8/2025. (Stofan, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
12 12 motion Extend or Shorten Time Thu 04/17 5:32 PM
Motion to Shorten Time To for First Day Motions Filed by Amanda M. Stofan on behalf of Debtor Locals Only Gifts, LLC (Stofan, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
11 11 motion Use Cash Collateral Thu 04/17 5:30 PM
Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Amanda M. Stofan on behalf of Debtor Locals Only Gifts, LLC Hearing scheduled 4/21/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN. (Stofan, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 motion Miscellaneous Motion Thu 04/17 5:28 PM
Miscellaneous Motion Entry of Order Authorizin Maintenance and Use of Existing Bank Accounts and Cash Management System Filed by Amanda M. Stofan on behalf of Debtor Locals Only Gifts, LLC Hearing scheduled 4/21/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN. (Stofan, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
9 9 motion Miscellaneous Motion Thu 04/17 5:25 PM
Miscellaneous Motion for Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Wages and Salaries and Other Employee Obligations Filed by Amanda M. Stofan on behalf of Debtor Locals Only Gifts, LLC Hearing scheduled 4/21/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN. (Stofan, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 motion Continuation of Utility Service Thu 04/17 5:21 PM
Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) Filed by Amanda M. Stofan on behalf of Debtor Locals Only Gifts, LLC Hearing scheduled 4/21/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN. (Stofan, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Modified Plan
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 04/17 12:18 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Douglas R. Johnson on behalf of Creditor BrightBridge, Inc.. (Johnson, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
6 6 court Case Assigned Wed 04/16 3:51 PM
Case assigned to Judge Nicholas W. Whittenburg (dlt)
Related: [-]
5 5 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 04/16 3:29 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:1:25-bk-10943] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A24911280. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
4 4 misc Equity Security Holders Wed 04/16 3:22 PM
Equity Security Holders Filed by Amanda M. Stofan on behalf of Debtor Locals Only Gifts, LLC. (Stofan, Amanda)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Wed 04/16 3:21 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Amanda M. Stofan on behalf of Debtor Locals Only Gifts, LLC. (Stofan, Amanda)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Debtor Electronic Noticing Election (DeBN) Wed 04/16 3:21 PM
Debtor Requests to Begin Electronic Noticing Filed by Amanda M. Stofan on behalf of Debtor Locals Only Gifts, LLC. (Stofan, Amanda)
Related: [-]
1 1 37 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 04/16 3:20 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Amanda M. Stofan on behalf of Locals Only Gifts, LLC. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/14/2025. (Stofan, Amanda)
Related: [-]