Maryland District Court
Case #: 1:25-mj-00972
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2025
Terminated:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 3:15 AM EDT
Defendant
David Kaufman (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Paul E Budlow
Office Of The United States Attorney
contact info

GPO Apr 18 2025
MEMORANDUM Summarizing the Court's Reasoning Regarding Detention Decision as to David Kaufman. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 4/18/2025. (km13, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 04/25/2025 6:47 AM EDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
1 1 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received from the District of Massachusetts as to David Kaufman (td4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION FOR AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PRETRIAL DETENTION by USA as to David Kaufman. (Budlow, Paul)
Related: [-]
3 3 Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to David Kaufman held on 4/16/2025 before Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson.(FTR Gold; Telita Davis, Courtroom 7B.) (td4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by David Kaufman (td4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
5 5 CONTRIBUTION ORDER as to David Kaufman. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 4/16/2025. (td4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to David Kaufman. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 4/16/2025. (td4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
7 7 WAIVER of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing by David Kaufman(td4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to David Kaufman. Detention Hearing set for 4/17/2025 03:00 PM in Courtroom 7B, 101 West Lombard Street, Baltimore, Maryland 21201, before Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson.. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 4/16/2025. (td4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER pursuant to Fed R Crim P 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act as to David Kaufman. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 4/16/2025. (td4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]