Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Robert J Jonker
Referred: Maarten Vermaat
Case #: 1:25-cv-00429
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
utility Copies Mailed Thu 04/24 1:35 PM
Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - PEM4 , Order Staying Case and Referring to PEM5 sent via U.S. Mail to Shelby Vernon Smith #672866 and copy of1 emailed to AG's Office (mg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
5 5 11 pgs order Order Staying Case and Referring to PEM Wed 04/23 1:21 PM
ORDER STAYING CASE and referring to PEM: the 90-day service period is tolled; participating defendants to enter a limited appearance by May 28, 2025; w/attached PEM forms and Program Description; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order to Proceed IFP - PEM Wed 04/23 1:19 PM
ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
3 3 misc Receipt of Case Notice Fri 04/18 7:49 AM
NOTICE of receipt of case (ns)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Fri 04/18 7:51 AM
Copy of Receipt of Case Notice3 sent via U.S. Mail to Shelby Vernon Smith #672866 (ns)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
2 2 motion Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees Fri 04/18 7:48 AM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (ns)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint with Magistrate Referral Fri 04/18 7:47 AM
COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against Unknown White filed by Shelby Vernon Smith #672866 (ns)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
misc Statement Regarding Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/Habeas Case) Fri 04/18 7:49 AM
STATEMENT RE CONSENT (as taken from1 ) by plaintiff Shelby Vernon Smith #672866 requesting the case be assigned to a district judge (ns)
Related: [-]