Original Case: 1:25-cv-00766

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cvus-05124
Typecivil us / united states
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 4:17 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
Donald J. Trump, in his official capacity as President of the United States
Represented By
Drew C. Ensign
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
August Edward Flentje
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Pamela Bondi, Attorney General of the United States, in her official capacity
Represented By
Drew C. Ensign
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
August Edward Flentje
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Kristi Noem, Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security, in her official capacity
Represented By
Drew C. Ensign
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
August Edward Flentje
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By
Drew C. Ensign
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
August Edward Flentje
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Madison Sheahan, Acting Director and Senior Official Performing the Duties of the Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, in her official capacity
Represented By
Drew C. Ensign
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
August Edward Flentje
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By
Drew C. Ensign
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
August Edward Flentje
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Marco Rubio, Secretary of State, in his official capacity
Represented By
Drew C. Ensign
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
August Edward Flentje
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
United States Department of State
Represented By
Drew C. Ensign
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
August Edward Flentje
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
J.G.G.
Represented By
Lee Gelernt
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Arthur B. Spitzer
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Hina Shamsi
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Scott Matthew Michelman
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Bradley Girard
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Omar Jadwat
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Pooja Boisture
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
G.F.F.
Represented By
Lee Gelernt
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Arthur B. Spitzer
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Hina Shamsi
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Scott Matthew Michelman
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Bradley Girard
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Omar Jadwat
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Pooja Boisture
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
J.G.O.
Represented By
Lee Gelernt
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Arthur B. Spitzer
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Hina Shamsi
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Scott Matthew Michelman
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Bradley Girard
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Omar Jadwat
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Pooja Boisture
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
W.G.H.
Represented By
Lee Gelernt
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Arthur B. Spitzer
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Hina Shamsi
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Scott Matthew Michelman
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Bradley Girard
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Omar Jadwat
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Pooja Boisture
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
J.A.V.
Represented By
Lee Gelernt
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Arthur B. Spitzer
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Hina Shamsi
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Scott Matthew Michelman
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Bradley Girard
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info
Omar Jadwat
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Pooja Boisture
Democracy Forward Foundation
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/19/2025 4:17 AM EDT
Thursday, April 17, 2025
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 25-5124
Related: [-]
30+ pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [2111506] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:25-cv-00766-JEB filed by Pamela Bondi, Kristi Noem, Marco Rubio, Madison Sheahan, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, DHS and DOS. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 25-5124 25-5124
Related: [-]
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [2111596] filed directing the parties to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 05/19/2025. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 05/19/2025. APPELLANT statement of issues due 05/19/2025. APPELLANT underlying decision due 05/19/2025. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 05/19/2025. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 05/19/2025. APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/19/2025. APPELLANT procedural motions due 05/19/2025. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/02/2025. APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 05/19/2025. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 05/19/2025. APPELLEE procedural motions due 05/19/2025. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/02/2025 25-5124
Related: [-]