Texas Western District Court
Case #: 4:25-mj-00211
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2025
Terminated:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 2:43 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Duty AUSA Pecos
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Irvin Giovanni Perez-Rodriguez (1)
Terminated: 04/17/2025
Represented By
Jaime Escuder - FPD
Federal Public Defender, Txw
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/20/2025 4:28 AM CDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
Arrest of Irvin Giovanni Perez-Rodriguez (jh1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
1 1 Petty Documents as to Irvin Giovanni Perez-Rodriguez (jh1)
Related: [-]