Colorado District Court
Judge:Richard T Gurley
Case #: 1:25-cv-01249
Nature of Suit375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act
Cause31:3729 - False Claims Act -- Liability
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 11:07 AM MDT
Defendant
Binance
Defendant
CoinBase
Defendant
FTX
Defendant
Tether
Plaintiff
Raghavendran Shankar
99 South Broadway Street APT 130
Denver, CO 80209


Docket last updated: 35 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
4 4 misc Letter Tue 04/22 10:44 AM
Letter from Raghavendran Shankar. (pklin, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
3 3 3 pgs order Order Mon 04/21 10:56 AM
Order Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies by Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 04/21/2025. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order . If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. (pklin, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
2 2 misc Case Assigned (PS) to Judge Mon 04/21 9:41 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley for Initial Review pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1 (a). Text Only Entry. (echa, )
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/21 9:41 AM
COMPLAINT against Binance, CoinBase, FTX, Tether, filed by Raghavendran Shankar.(echa, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continuation of Main Document,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit