New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Frederic Block
Referred: James R Cho
Case #: 1:25-cv-02199
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 21, 2025 4:07 PM EDT
Defendant
Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By
Howard F. Strongin
Strongin Rothman & Abrams, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Claudio Polanco
Plaintiff
Josefina Valerio


Docket last updated: 75 minutes ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/28 1:36 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Certificate of Service by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Adler, Martin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/24 12:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Martin Menachem Adler on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Adler, Martin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/22 1:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M Butler on behalf of All Plaintiffs (notification declined or already on case) (Butler, Patrick)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 04/22 10:03 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Tue 04/22 10:02 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (CV)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/22 10:01 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CV)
Related: [-]
misc ECF Admission and Registration Notification - Removal Tue 04/22 10:02 AM
This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (CV)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/21 3:11 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Strongin, Howard)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Jury Demand Mon 04/21 3:10 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Strongin, Howard)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 04/21 3:09 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Queens, case number 707968/2025. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANYEDC-18971449) (Strongin, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Customer Statement,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Email