Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Phillip J Green
Case #: 1:25-cv-00440
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order to File Amended Pleading on the Form Thu 04/24 10:01 AM
ORDER directing the filing party to submit an amended pleading in proper form within 28 days or the action may be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order to Proceed IFP (Habeas) Thu 04/24 10:01 AM
ORDER granting petitioner leave to proceed in forma pauperis in a habeas action; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Thu 04/24 10:28 AM
Copy of Order to Proceed IFP (Habeas)4 , Order to File Amended Pleading on the Form5 with required form and Notice3 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael Anthony Thigpen #575347 (ns) Modified text on 4/24/2025 (ns)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
3 3 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) Mon 04/21 2:54 PM
NOTICE to petitioner regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 5/12/2025 (ns)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees Mon 04/21 2:53 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (ns)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Financial Documents
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Mon 04/21 2:52 PM
PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Michael Anthony Thigpen #570347 (ns)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Mon 04/21 2:55 PM
Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas)3 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael Anthony Thigpen #570347 (ns)
Related: [-]