Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Sally J Berens
Case #: 1:25-cv-00441
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order to Answer (Habeas) Thu 04/24 1:37 PM
ORDER TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHER PLEADING: this order, petition and brief served electronically on Michigan Department of Corrections and Attorney General of the State of MI; respondent to answer the habeas petition within 180 days; no extensions will be granted; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,
Att: 2 Brief in Support of Habeas Petition,
Att: 3 Exhibit
5 5 2 pgs order Order to Proceed IFP (Habeas) Thu 04/24 1:34 PM
ORDER granting petitioner leave to proceed in forma pauperis in a habeas action; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Thu 04/24 2:13 PM
Copy of Order to Answer (Habeas),6 , Order to Proceed IFP (Habeas)5 sent via U.S. Mail to Lamont Cedric Plair #196910 (eod)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
4 4 misc Receipt of Case Notice Tue 04/22 10:15 AM
NOTICE of receipt of case (eod)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Tue 04/22 10:17 AM
Copy of Receipt of Case Notice4 sent via U.S. Mail to Lamont Cedric Plair #196910 (eod)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
3 3 misc Brief (Related Document) Tue 04/22 10:15 AM
BRIEF by petitioner Lamont Cedric Plair #196910 re1 Memorandum of Law (eod)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits
2 2 motion Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees Tue 04/22 9:57 AM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (eod)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Financial Documents
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Tue 04/22 9:53 AM
PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Lamont Cedric Plair #196910 (eod)
Related: [-]
misc Statement Regarding Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/Habeas Case) Tue 04/22 9:54 AM
STATEMENT RE CONSENT (as taken from1 ) by petitioner Lamont Cedric Plair #196910 consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (eod)
Related: [-]