Maine Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 2:25-bk-20100
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
The Mark Real Estate Holdings, LLC, Debtor
100 US Route 1
Cumberland, ME 04021
Represented By
Adam R. Prescott, Esq.
Bernstein Shur Sawyer & Nelson, PA
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee
537 Congress Street, Suite 300
Portland, ME 04101


Docket last updated: 33 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
26 26 audio Tue 04/29 11:12 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/29/2025 10:01:16 AM ]. File Size [ 20842 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:57:54 ]. (courtaudio)
Related: [-]
25 25 answer Objection Tue 04/29 9:02 AM
Objection Filed by DeStefano & Associates, Inc. Related [+]. (Altieri, Matthew)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Borrow filed by Debtor The Mark Real Estate Holdings, LLC, Motion to Use Cash Collateral
24 24 court Entry Tue 04/29 8:46 AM
Entry - Proposed forms of orders not included Related [+]. (mep)
Related: [-] 21 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Creditor Builders Capital Finance, LLC
Monday, April 28, 2025
23 23 answer Objection Mon 04/28 6:10 PM
Initial Objection Filed by Builders Capital Finance, LLC Related [+]. (Egdall, Joan) Modified title on 4/29/2025 (mep)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Borrow filed by Debtor The Mark Real Estate Holdings, LLC, Motion to Use Cash Collateral
22 22 answer Response Mon 04/28 5:12 PM
Response Filed by James A. McBrady, Inc. Related [+]. (Burns, Aaron)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Borrow filed by Debtor The Mark Real Estate Holdings, LLC, Motion to Use Cash Collateral
21 21 motion Appear pro hac vice Mon 04/28 4:04 PM
Motion for Michael Schuster and Carter Wallace to Appear pro hac vice with Certificate of Service . Filed by Builders Capital Finance, LLC. (Egdall, Joan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
20 20 order 9013 Deficiency Order Mon 04/28 2:16 PM
Rule 9013 Deficiency Order. Motion Terminated on the System Related [+]. (mep)
Related: [-] 18 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Creditor Builders Capital Finance, LLC
19 19 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 04/28 9:21 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Aaron P. Burns Esq. Filed by on behalf of James A. McBrady, Inc.. (Burns, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
18 18 motion Appear pro hac vice Fri 04/25 4:52 PM
Creditor's Motion for Michael Schuster and Carter Wallace to Appear pro hac vice . Filed by Builders Capital Finance, LLC. (Egdall, Joan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate for Admission.MSchuster
Att: 2 Exhibit Certification for Admission.CWallace
17 17 answer Objection Fri 04/25 3:44 PM
Objection Filed by Seabee Electric, Inc. Related [+]. (Perkins, David)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Borrow filed by Debtor The Mark Real Estate Holdings, LLC, Motion to Use Cash Collateral
16 16 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 04/25 1:20 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with Certificate of Serviced by Joan Marie Egdall Esq. Filed by on behalf of Builders Capital Finance, LLC. (Egdall, Joan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document**ADI** Fri 04/25 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 04/24/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order to Comply
14 14 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 04/24 3:29 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Bodie B. Colwell Esq. Filed by on behalf of Optimum Building Systems, LLC. (Colwell, Bodie)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Thu 04/24 3:06 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. (Prescott, Adam)
Related: [-] 11 Hearing (Bk) filed by Debtor The Mark Real Estate Holdings, LLC
12 12 court Entry Thu 04/24 2:47 PM
Entry - Certificate of Service has not been filed Related [+]. (mep)
Related: [-] 11 Hearing (Bk) filed by Debtor The Mark Real Estate Holdings, LLC
11 11 misc Hearing Set Thu 04/24 1:57 PM
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Expedited Interim Hearing Filed by The Mark Real Estate Holdings, LLC Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/29/2025 at 10:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom, Portland. Objections due by 4/29/2025. (Prescott, Adam) Modified on 4/25/2025 to add reference to Cash Collateral Motion (srd)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Borrow filed by Debtor The Mark Real Estate Holdings, LLC, Motion to Use Cash Collateral
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Thu 04/24 11:55 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. (Prescott, Adam)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor The Mark Real Estate Holdings, LLC,8 Motion to Borrow filed by Debtor The Mark Real Estate Holdings, LLC, Motion to Use Cash Collateral
9 9 order Order re: Request for Expedited hearing Thu 04/24 10:42 AM
Order re: Request for Expedited hearing. The request for an expedited hearing to consider the relief sought in the Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order on an Interim and then Final Basis; (I) Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Postpetition Financing Pursuant to §364 of the Bankruptcy Code; (II) Authorizing the Use of Cash Collateral; (III) Granting Liens and Super-Priority Claims is hereby GRANTED. Movant is directed to promptly file and serve a notice of hearing scheduling the hearing for April 29, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. at Bankruptcy Courtroom, Portland. The matter will not appear on the court calendar until the notice of hearing is filed. A certificate evidencing service in accordance with local rules must be filed prior to the hearing. /s/ Peter G. Cary. Related [+] (mep)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Borrow filed by Debtor The Mark Real Estate Holdings, LLC, Motion to Use Cash Collateral
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
8 8 20 pgs motion Borrow Wed 04/23 5:12 PM
Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order on an Interim and then Final Basis; (I) Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Postpetition Financing Pursuant to §364 of the Bankruptcy Code; (II) Authorizing the Use of Cash Collateral; (III) Granting Liens and Super-Priority Claims; (IV) Granting Request for Expedited Determination and Limitation of Notice; and (V) Scheduling a Final Hearing/Request for Expedited Determination Regarding the Interim Relief Only Filed by The Mark Real Estate Holdings, LLC. (Prescott, Adam) Modified to match title on 4/24/2025 (mep)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - DIP Loan Term Sheet
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Lien and Claim Summary
Att: 3 Proposed Order
7 7 2 pgs misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 04/23 9:44 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Kellie W. Fisher Esq. Filed by on behalf of Titan Funding, LLC. (Fisher, Kellie)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 04/23 9:11 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Stephen G. Morrell Esq. Filed by on behalf of Office of U.S. Trustee. (Morrell, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
5 5 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 04/22 6:10 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement filed. Corporate parents added to case: Titan Funding Holdings 1, LLC. Filed by The Mark Real Estate Holdings, LLC. (Prescott, Adam)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order to Comply Tue 04/22 4:22 PM
Order to Comply Requiring the Filing of Missing Documents and/or Information and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case. Documents Required: Statement of Financial Affairs due 5/6/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 5/6/2025. (mep)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Entry Tue 04/22 4:09 PM
Entry - Corporate Ownership Statement has not been filed Related [+]. (mep)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor The Mark Real Estate Holdings, LLC
2 2 1 pgs misc Equity Security Holders Tue 04/22 11:58 AM
Equity Security Holders Filed by The Mark Real Estate Holdings, LLC. (Prescott, Adam)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)**OPEN BK CASE** Tue 04/22 11:55 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual . Schedules and statements to be filed. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by The Mark Real Estate Holdings, LLC. (Prescott, Adam)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card**ADI** Tue 04/22 11:56 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-20100 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A5034786. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1