Colorado District Court
Judge:S Kato Crews
Referred: N Reid Neureiter
Case #: 1:25-cv-01277
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Case in other court:Arapahoe County District Court, 2025CV30714
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 23, 2025 11:07 AM MDT
Defendant
Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By
Michael T. Sullivan
Tucker Holmes, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Shira Good
Plaintiff
William Good


Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
11 11 order Order Mon 04/28 11:29 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4/28/2025. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/10/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 7/17/2025 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tlove, )
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 04/28 10:28 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, and (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the request of the parties by motion, this Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Alternatively, the Magistrate Judge, at their discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Standing Order and Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By Judge S. Kato Crews on 4/28/2025. Text Only Entry (skcja, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
9 9 1 pgs misc Memorandum Returning Case Fri 04/25 12:05 PM
MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE. Case randomly reassigned to Judge S. Kato Crews and drawn to Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all further proceedings. Judge Robert E. Blackburn is no longer assigned to case. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 04/24 11:16 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jessica A. Breckenridge on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jessica A. Breckenridge added to party Shira Good (pty:pla), Attorney Jessica A. Breckenridge added to party William Good(pty:pla) (Breckenridge, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
7 7 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Wed 04/23 10:48 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (efoga, )
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Case Assigned to Judge Wed 04/23 10:48 AM
Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint Wed 04/23 10:47 AM
AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, and Civil Case Cover Sheet upon Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company on 3/24/2025. (efoga, )
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Complaint Wed 04/23 10:46 AM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, filed by Shira Good, William Good.(efoga, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases Wed 04/23 10:46 AM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Removal: Administrative Notices Wed 04/23 10:44 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE REMINDER to Filer. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1 and 28 U.S.C. Section 1446a when filing a Notice of Removal. (Text only entry.) (efoga, )
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 04/23 10:17 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corporation from District Court Arapahoe County, Case Number 2025cv30714. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-10295299), filed by ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corporation.(Sullivan, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A Complaint State Court,
Att: 3 Exhibit B Return of Service - State Court,
Att: 4 Exhibit C Summons - State Court,
Att: 5 Exhibit D Civil Cover Sheet - State Court,
Att: 6 Exhibit E Secretary of State,
Att: 7 Exhibit F Register of Actions - State Court,
Att: 8 Exhibit G DRO - State Court