New York Northern District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-00163
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 3:19 AM EDT
Defendant
Nancy Nayely Pascual (1)
Represented By
Jeremy B. Sporn
Office Of The Federal Public Defender - Albany Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ashlyn Jessica Miranda
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/25/2025 4:26 AM EDT
Monday, March 31, 2025
TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for Initial Appearance held on 3/31/2025 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Interpreter is sworn in. Defendant acknowledges receipt of complaint and accompanying affidavit. Defendant is advised of her rights, charges, and maximum penalties. Court reviews the CJA23 form and determines that the Defendant is eligible for counsel and appoints OFPD. Defense counsel notes for the record a possible conflict that could arise in representing both Defendants but will represent Defendant today until other arrangements are made, if necessary. As Defendant is not a citizen of the United States, she is advised that the Consular officiate of Guatemala may be notified of Defendants arrest; Defendant requests this notification. Government argues for detention due to risk of non-appearance/flight and requests a detention hearing. Defense argues against risk of flight. Detention Hearing is set for 4/3/2025 at 2 p.m. Pretrial Services will prepare a basic report before the hearing. A Preliminary Hearing will be addressed at the 4/3/2025 Detention Hearing. Gov't is reminded of its obligations under Brady v. Maryland. Defendant is remanded to the USMS. [Appearances: AUSA Ashlyn Miranda; FPD Jeremy Sporn; Court Reporter: Jacquelyn Gecewicz; USPO: Kristen Bent. Time: 2:45-3:08 PM] (spl) [1:25-mj-00096-DJS]
Related: [-]
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Nancy Nayely Pascual (1). (spl) [1:25-mj-00096-DJS]
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Nancy Nayely Pascual: Detention Hearing set for 4/3/2025 at 2:00 PM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. (spl) [1:25-mj-00096-DJS]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Jeremy B. Sporn for Nancy Nayely Pascual. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 3/31/2025. (spl) [1:25-mj-00096-DJS]
Related: [-]
4 4 RULE 5(f) ORDER as to Nancy Nayely Pascual: This Order is entered, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act, to confirm the Government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and to summarize the possible consequences of violating those obligations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 3/31/2025. (spl) [1:25-mj-00096-DJS]
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Nancy Nayely Pascual (spl) [1:25-mj-00096-DJS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeremy B. Sporn appearing for Nancy Nayely Pascual (Sporn, Jeremy) [1:25-mj-00096-DJS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
8 8 PRETRIAL SERVICES INVESTIGATION REPORT - [LODGED] as to Nancy Nayely Pascual. [This document has been electronically lodged with the Court and is viewable by ONLY the attorney for the government, the attorney for the defendant, and the presiding judge. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited.] (bll, ) [1:25-mj-00096-DJS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for Detention Hearing held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart as to Nancy Nayely Pascual on 4/3/2025: Counsel have received and reviewed the Pretrial Services Report; no objections are noted. Government argues for detention based on risk of flight. Defense argues for release based on no criminal history, Defendant's age and positive work history and argues that the Court could set conditions for release until Defendant's reappearance. After hearing arguments from counsel and reviewing the PTS Report, the Court asks for additional information on where Defendant will reside upon potential release. Due to this request, defense requests a continuance in order to gather more information about the intended domicile of Defendant (located in NJ) and provide it to the Court. Defense's request is granted and, upon receipt of said information, the Court will continue this hearing. Defendant is remanded to the custody of the USMS. [Appearances: AUSA Ashlyn Miranda; FPD Jeremy Sporn; USPO Melyssa Inman; Court Reporter: Jacquelyn Gecewicz. Time: 3:05-3:31pm] (spl) [1:25-mj-00096-DJS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
9 9 STIPULATION by USA to continuance and motion for exclusion of time (Miranda, Ashlyn) [1:25-mj-00096-DJS]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
10 10 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Nancy Nayely Pascual. The time within which an Indictment must be filed is enlarged 30 days; time excluded from 4/11/2025 until 5/11/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 4/11/2025. (spl) [1:25-mj-00096-DJS]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
Notice of Case Assignment - Waiver of Indictment: Case Caption: USA v. Nancy Nayely Pascual; Case Number Assigned: 1:25-cr-163; Assigned Judge: Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino. (tll) [1:25-mj-00096-DJS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
TEXT NOTICE SETTING WAIVER AND PLEA HEARING as to Nancy Nayely Pascual (1:25-cr-163 MAD): The Waiver and Plea Hearing as to Nancy Nayely Pascual is set for 4/24/2025 at 10:15 AM in Albany before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino. (ban) [1:25-mj-00096-DJS]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
11 11 Letter from defense counsel as to Nancy Nayely Pascual requesting immediate sentencing and term of time served (Sporn, Jeremy) [1:25-mj-00096-DJS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
TEXT Minute Entry for Waiver and Plea and Sentencing Hearing as to Nancy Nayely Pascual held on 4/24/2025, before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino: Appearances by Ashlyn Miranda, AUSA for the Government; Jeremy Sporn, AFPD for the defendant; and Spanish Interpreter Dr. Pelayo Rodriguez (sworn); The defendant is sworn and questioned by the Court; The waiver of indictment is executed and accepted by the Court; Information 1:25-cr-163 MAD is handed up for filing; A written plea agreement is handed up for filing; The defendant is further questioned by the Court; Counsel for the Government addresses the Court regarding the factual basis for the plea, guidelines, maximum penalties, and stipulations; Counsel for the defendant addresses the Court; The defendant is further questioned by the Court; Plea entered by Nancy Nayely Pascual (1) Guilty Count 1 of the Information; The Plea Agreement is Accepted as to Nancy Nayely Pascual; The Court accepts the defendant's plea of Guilty to Count 1 of the Information; The Court does not find a need for the presentence investigation report - the PSR is waived pursuant to Rule 32 of the Fed.R.Crim.Proc.; The Court is prepared to proceed directly to sentencing; Counsel for the Government addresses the Court and requests a guideline a sentence; Counsel for the defendant addresses the Court and requests a sentence of time served; the defendant addresses the Court; The Court imposes sentence - The defendant is sentenced on Count 1 of the Information to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons to be imprisoned for a term of TIME SERVED; No term of supervised release to follow pursuant to U.S.S.G. 5D1.1(c); No Fine; No Additional Special Assessment; Special Assessment of $100.00 (Ordered Remitted); Parties advised of appeal rights; The defendant is Remanded. (Court Reporter Jackie Gecewicz, CRD Britney Norton [Time 10:20 a.m. - 10:51 a.m.]) (ban)
Related: [-]
12 12 TEXT ORDER granting11 Letter Request for immediate sentencing as to Nancy Nayely Pascual (1). Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 04/25/2025.(ban)
Related: [-]
14 14 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT as to Nancy Nayely Pascual. (ban)
Related: [-]
15 15 FELONY INFORMATION as to Nancy Nayely Pascual (1) count 1. (ban)
Related: [-]
16 16 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Nancy Nayely Pascual. (ban)
Related: [-]