New York Southern District Court
Judge:Alvin K Hellerstein
Case #: 1:25-cv-02733
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 27, 2025 9:04 PM EDT
Defendant
Shenzhen Kaichenxing Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Quanzhou Fengze District Haotong Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Senfull (guangdong) Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shanghai ROFEE Industry Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shanghai Yikemai Industrial Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shaodong City Yejiping Town Shangwei Department Store
Defendant
Shenzhen Beilisi Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shenzhen Fuhengjie Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shenzhen Glassone Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Mannikang (shenzhen) Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shenzhen Longgang District Shiyun Daily Department Store
Defendant
Shenzhen Yingfeier Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shishi City Jun Xiu Clothing Firm
Defendant
Xiamen Tongan District Billion Ricks Department Store
Defendant
Xiamen Yucai Cosmetics Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yiwu Jiamai Trade Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yiwu Joinwave Trading Company
Defendant
Yiwu Juke E-Commerce Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Guangzhou Ouyeli Cosmetic Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yiwu Zz Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Chongqing Aqua Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Chongqing Qijing E-Commerce Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Chongqing Qingyitang Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Foshan Fanlentina Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Gansu Huatuo Xinhui Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Gansu Tingli Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Guangzhou Mailaifu Biotechnology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Guangzhou Unique Aroma Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Guangzhou Xinzheng Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Guangzhou Zhenxin Flavors & Fragrances Co., Ltd.
Defendant
HK MiaoSi International Co., Limited
Defendant
Hebei Chefhi International Trade Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Jiangmen Jianghai Anyin Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Jingkai District Minyaqin Department Store
Plaintiff
Parfums Christian Dior, S.A.
Represented By
Ashly Erin Sands
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Danielle S. Futterman
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Melissa Levine
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Gabriela N. Nastasi
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Jason M. Drangel
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
DEF
Terminated: 04/24/2025
Plaintiff
ABC
Terminated: 04/24/2025


Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
14 14 respoth Declaration (non-motion) Fri 04/25 4:42 PM
DECLARATION OF NICOLAS LAMBERT AND ACCOMPANYING EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; AN ORDER RESTRAINING MERCHANT STOREFRONTS AND DEFENDANTS' ASSETS WITH THE FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS; AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE; ORDER AUTHORIZING BIFURCATED AND ALTERNATIVE SERVICE AND ORDER AUTHORIZING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY:. ***This document was previously filed under seal in Envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 3 ***..(js)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
13 13 respoth Declaration (non-motion) Fri 04/25 4:14 PM
DECLARATION OF MELISSA J. LEVINE AND ACCOMPANYING EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; AN ORDER RESTRAINING MERCHANT STOREFRONTS AND DEFENDANTS' ASSETS WITH THE FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS; AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE; ORDER AUTHORIZING BIFURCATED AND ALTERNATIVE SERVICE AND ORDER AUTHORIZING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY:. ***This document was previously filed under seal in Envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 3 ***.(js)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit A Part 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C
12 12 misc Proposed Temporary Restraining Order Fri 04/25 4:01 PM
PROPOSED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; ORDER RESTRAINING DEFENDANTS' MERCHANT STOREFRONTS AND DEFENDANTS' ASSETS WITH THE FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE; ORDER AUTHORIZING BIFURCATED AND ALTERNATIVE SERVICE; AND ORDER AUTHORIZING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY: ***This document was previously filed under seal in Envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 3 ***.(js) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
Related: [-]
11 11 30+ pgs respoth Memorandum of Law (non-motion) Fri 04/25 3:49 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER;' ORDER RESTRAINING MERCHANT STOREFRONTS AND DEFENDANTS' ASSETS WITH THE FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS; AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE; ORDER AUTHORIZING BIFURCATED AND ALTERNATIVE SERVICE AND ORDER AUTHORIZING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY: ***This document was previously filed under seal in Envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 3 ***.(js)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Proposed Order Fri 04/25 12:33 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO EXCEED WORD LIMIT: ***This document was previously filed under seal in Envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 3 ***.(js) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
Related: [-]
9 9 motion File Excess Pages Fri 04/25 12:23 PM
MOTION TO EXCEED WORD LIMIT OF PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; ORDER RESTRAINING DEFENDANTS USER ACCOUNTS, MERCHANT STOREFRONT AND DEFENDANT'S ASSETS WITH THE FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS; AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE; ORDER AUTHORIZING BIFURCATED AND ALTERNATIVE SERVICE; AND ORDER AUTHORIZING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY: ***This document was previously filed under seal in Envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 3 ***.(js)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc AO 120 Form Trademark - Case Opening - Submitted Fri 04/25 11:52 AM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). ***This document was previously filed under seal in Envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 3 ***.(js)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/25 11:49 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent LVMH Moet Hennessy Louis Vuitton for Parfums Christian Dior, S.A. Document filed by Parfums Christian Dior, S.A. ***This document was previously filed under seal in Envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 3 ***.(js)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 04/25 11:28 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED: ***This document was previously filed under seal in Envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 3 ***.(js)
Related: [-]
5 5 33 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/25 11:04 AM
COMPLAINT:. ***This document was previously filed under seal in Envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 3 ***.(js)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Part 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit A Part 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/25 10:59 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. ***This document was previously filed under seal in Envelope 2 and unsealed by docket entry 3 ***.(js)
Related: [-]
3 3 3 pgs order Order Fri 04/25 10:00 AM
UNSEALING ORDER: WHEREAS the Court orders that this Action be unsealed, and Records Management upload all documents filed to date on the Electronic Case Filing system. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/24/2025) (js)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein: Evidentiary Hearing held on 4/24/2025. Defendant failed to appear. Default judgment to be filed in 60 days. (Court Reporter Rebecca Forman) (Jones, Brigitte)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
2 2 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
Related: [-]
1 1 ***Sealed*** ORDER, Case sealed. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 04/01/2025) (jus)
Related: [-]
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jus)
Related: [-]