Colorado District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-00106
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 1:20 AM MDT
Defendant
Abraham Gonzalez-Romero (1)
Represented By
Kelly D. Christl
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Edwin Garreth Winstead, III
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Michael J. Lewis
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/26/2025 2:51 AM MDT
Friday, March 14, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Abraham Gonzalez-Romero (1). (sphil, ) [1:25-mj-00056-STV *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Information Sheet,
Att: 2 Affidavit
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued in case as to Abraham Gonzalez-Romero. (sphil, ) [1:25-mj-00056-STV *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
3 3 INDICTMENT as to Abraham Gonzalez-Romero (1) count(s) 1. (angar, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Information Sheet