1
|
|
1
MOTION to Seal by USA as to Andrae Maurice Whitaker. (kan) [1:25-mj-02482-JG]
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal as to Andrae Maurice Whitaker (1). Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 3/11/2025. See attached document for full details. (kan) [1:25-mj-02482-JG]
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
COMPLAINT as to Andrae Maurice Whitaker (1). (kan) [1:25-mj-02482-JG]
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
Government's ORAL MOTION to Unseal Case as to Andrae Maurice Whitaker. (cdb1) [1:25-mj-02482-JG]
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
ORDER granting 5 Government's Ore Tenus Motion to Unseal Case as to Andrae Maurice Whitaker (1). Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 3/12/2025. See attached document for full details. (cdb1) [1:25-mj-02482-JG]
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
NOTICE OF TEMPORARY ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: appearing for Andrae Maurice Whitaker (cdb1) [1:25-mj-02482-JG]
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
Defense ORAL MOTION for Pretrial Detention as to Andrae Maurice Whitaker. Responses due by 3/26/2025. (cdb1) [1:25-mj-02482-JG]
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 8 Defense Ore Tenus Motion for Pretrial Detention Hearing as to Andrae Maurice Whitaker (1). Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 3/12/2025. (cdb1) [1:25-mj-02482-JG]
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
Minute Order for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman: Initial Appearance as to Andrae Maurice Whitaker held on 3/12/2025. Bond recommendation/set: Andrae Maurice Whitaker (1) TEMP- Pretrial Detention. Date of Location Custody (Arrest or Surrender): 3/12/2025.. Arraignment set for 3/27/2025 01:00 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Detention Hearing set for 3/18/2025 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 3/27/2025 01:00 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 3/27/2025 01:00 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. (Digital 13:33:36; 14:15:21) It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence- that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and ORDERS the United States to do so. The government has a duty to disclose any evidence that goes to negating the defendants guilt, the credibility of a witness, or that would reduce a potential sentence. The defendant is entitled to this information without a request. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 3/12/2025. (cdb1) [1:25-mj-02482-JG]
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis: Status Conference RE; Pretrial Detention as to Andrae Maurice Whitaker held on 3/18/2025., Bond Set as to Andrae Maurice Whitaker (1) STIP: Pretrial Detention with right to revisit. No Hearing held. (Digital 10:35:22) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 3/18/2025. (cdb1) [1:25-mj-02482-JG]
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Report re: Counsel, Preliminary Examination, and Arraignment by USA as to Andrae Maurice Whitaker. Responses due by 4/9/2025.(Koffsky, Jacob) [1:25-mj-02482-JG]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Text of Proposed Order
|
13
|
|
13
ORDER granting12 Unopposed Motion to Continue Report Re: Counsel, Preliminary Hearing and Arraignment as to Andrae Maurice Whitaker (1). The Court finds that the ends of justice served by granting this continuance outweigh the interests of the defendant and the public in a speedy trial. Time excluded from 3/27/2025 until 4/3/2025. Arraignment reset for 4/3/2025 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination reset for 4/3/2025 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Report Re: Counsel Hearing reset for 4/3/2025 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 3/26/2025. See attached document for full details. (aw) (aw). [1:25-mj-02482-JG]
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid: Status Conference RE: Report Re Counsel/Preliminary/Arraignment as to Andrae Maurice Whitaker held on 3/27/2025. Defendant present before the court. Case Continued per DE#12. (Digital 13:34:47) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 3/27/2025. (cdb1) [1:25-mj-02482-JG]
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
INDICTMENT as to Andrae Maurice Whittaker (1) count(s) 1, 2 and FORFEITURE ALLEGATIONS. (aw) (fbn). Modified on 3/31/2025 (aw).
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
(3/28/2025) Restricted Unredacted Indictment
|