New Jersey District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00180
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 3:58 AM EDT
Defendant
GAFUR ABDUDZHAMILOVICH ALIEV (1)
Represented By
LINDA D. FOSTER
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
JOYCE M. MALLIET
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/26/2025 5:41 AM EDT
Thursday, March 27, 2025
Notice of Allocation and Assignment [Newark - Judge Claire C. Cecchi] as to GAFUR ABDUDZHAMILOVICH ALIEV (msd)
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED INDICTMENT as to GAFUR ABDUDZHAMILOVICH ALIEV (1) counts 1 and 2. (msd)
Related: [-]
2 2 SEALING ORDER as to GAFUR ABDUDZHAMILOVICH ALIEV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/27/2025. (msd)
Related: [-]
3 3 ARREST Warrant Issued in case as to GAFUR ABDUDZHAMILOVICH ALIEV. (msd)
Related: [-]