New Mexico District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00606
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 27, 2025 1:45 AM MDT
Defendant
Brian Alexis Pastrana-Ramirez (1)
Represented By
Tania Chozet
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Interested Party
US Probation and Pretrial Services
Represented By
Jennifer D Ramos
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Richard C Williams
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 2:41 AM MDT
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
Arrest of Brian Alexis Pastrana-Ramirez (cfa) [2:25-mj-00479-JHR]
Related: [-]
Hearing as to Brian Alexis Pastrana-Ramirez: Initial Appearance set for 3/19/2025 at 09:07 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. (cfa) [2:25-mj-00479-JHR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
U.S. Probation and Pretrial Services added as interested party.(Ramos, Jennifer) [2:25-mj-00479-JHR]
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to Brian Alexis Pastrana-Ramirez. Attorney Richard C Williams for USA added. (ac) [2:25-mj-00479-JHR]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Brian Alexis Pastrana-Ramirez. (ac) [2:25-mj-00479-JHR]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Tania Chozet for Brian Alexis Pastrana-Ramirez by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter (ac) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:25-mj-00479-JHR]
Related: [-]
3 3 Clerk's Minutes of Initial Presentment hearing held before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter: Initial Appearance as to Brian Alexis Pastrana-Ramirez held on 3/19/2025. Defendant advised of rights/penalties. Attorney to be appointed. Appearances: AUSA: Jeffrey Thomas Kent; AFPD: Andre Poissant; FPD Standing In; Interpreter: Armida Hernandez. Recorded: Liberty-Sierra Blanca. Rights: 10:09 AM - 10:14 AM. Time In Session: 10:14 AM - 10:20 AM. Courtroom Deputy: Rebecca Helmick. NOTICE OF HEARING: Preliminary/Detention Hearing is hereby set before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter for 3/24/2025, at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower), U.S. District Courthouse, 100 N. Church St., Las Cruces, New Mexico. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (ac) [2:25-mj-00479-JHR]
Related: [-]
4 4 Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and orders it to do so. Failing to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, or sanctions by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter (ac) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:25-mj-00479-JHR]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
6 6 WAIVER of Hearings by Brian Alexis Pastrana-Ramirez (Chozet, Tania) [2:25-mj-00479-JHR]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Brian Alexis Pastrana-Ramirez by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. The Court having reviewed the waiver of preliminary hearing, waiver of personal presence at the preliminary hearing and request for tolling of Grand Jury presentment and waiver of detention, now finds that the ends of justice served by granting the request to toll the speedy indictment computation outweigh the interest of the defendant and the public in a speedy indictment. The Court expressly finds that the public's interest in a speedy indictment in this case is outweighed by: (1) the public's interest in a reasonably expeditious resolution of the case; (2) the public's interest in relieving the burden that would be placed on judicial, prosecutorial, defense, and law enforcement resources if the case proceeded to a preliminary examination and/or a speedy indictment; and (3) the potential benefit conferred upon the defendant in an expedited resolution of the case. IT IS THEREFORE. ORDERED, ADJUDGED. and DECREED that pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§3161(h)(7)(A), a period of time of 75 days from today's date is hereby tolled and excluded from the computation of speedy indictment. At the expiration of this 75-day period, the 30-day period pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§3161(b) for speedy indictment shall resume. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the preliminary and detention hearings are vacated. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ac) [2:25-mj-00479-JHR]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Brian Alexis Pastrana-Ramirez by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter (ac) [2:25-mj-00479-JHR]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Brian Alexis Pastrana-Ramirez: Change of Plea Hearing set for 3/28/2025 at 09:10 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. [ Interpreter Needed ](vrr) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:25-mj-00479-JHR]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
10 10 INFORMATION as to Brian Alexis Pastrana-Ramirez (1) count(s) 1. (gr)
Related: [-]
11 11 CONSENT TO PLEA BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Brian Alexis Pastrana-Ramirez (gr)
Related: [-]
12 12 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Brian Alexis Pastrana-Ramirez (gr)
Related: [-]
13 13 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter: Plea Hearing as to Brian Alexis Pastrana-Ramirez held on 3/28/2025, Plea entered by Brian Alexis Pastrana-Ramirez (1) Guilty Count 1. Related [+] (Interpreter: Armida Hernandez) (gr)
Related: [-] cording Info: LCR-Sierra Blanca