Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-00035
Case Filed:Jan 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 2:17 AM CDT
Defendant
Marquise Edward Johnson (1)
Represented By
Vincent Rene Carrizales, II
Law Office Of Vincent Carrizales
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Abby Policastro-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Myria Wynn Boehm-DOJ
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 2:37 AM CDT
Friday, June 07, 2024
4 4 ***DISREGARD-ENTERED IN ERROR*** MOTION for Pretrial Detention, MOTION to Continue filed by Marquis Edward Johnson Attorney Abby Policastro-DOJ added to party Marquis Edward Johnson(pty:dft) (Policastro-DOJ, Abby) (Main Document 4 replaced on 1/7/2025) (mcrd). Modified on 1/7/2025 (mcrd). [3:24-mj-00274-BK *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
5 5 SEALED INDICTMENT with Forfeiture Notice as to Marquise Edward Johnson (2) count(s) 1, 2. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (kcr)
Related: [-]