Steven Shapiro v. Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | R Gary Klausner |
Referred: | Stephen J Hillman |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-09762 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Dec 19, 2014 |
Re-opened: | Dec 22, 2014 |
Terminated: | Mar 02, 2015 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 04, 2015 6:39 AM PDT |
Defendant
Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Shapiro
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, March 02, 2015 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Mon 03/02 2:17 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Steven Shapiro. Dismissal is Without Prejudice.(Fiske, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, February 17, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 02/18 3:24 PM
MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge R. Gary Klausner: Case called. Court and counsel confer regarding motion to consolidate actions or filing of an amended complaint to include all parties. Counsel shall file an amended complaint on or before March 2, 2015. Defendants shall have 21 days to file a responsive pleading. The Rule 23g deadline for filing a class certification motion shall be filed within 90 days of the date the amended complaint is filed. Court Reporter: Sandra MacNeil. (pso) |
|
Wednesday, February 11, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Thu 02/12 9:38 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6)) 25 , Notice of Motion,26 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Document #25, correct event is Motions and Related Filings: Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Document> Memorandum in Support of Motion. Document #26, correct event is Motion and Related Filings: Motion> Dismiss.. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bp) |
|
Monday, February 09, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Notice of Motion
Mon 02/09 8:53 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION re MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6)) 25 filed by Defendant Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/16/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Casamassima, Christopher) |
|
25 | 25
23
pgs
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Mon 02/09 8:52 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6)) filed by Defendant Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc..(Casamassima, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 05, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/05 2:02 PM
ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting23 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Noah A. Levine on behalf of Defendant Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc., designating David C. Marcus as local counsel. (pso) |
|
Friday, January 30, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 01/30 3:02 PM
APPLICATION for attorney Noah A. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15137936 paid.) filed by Defendant Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc..(Marcus, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, January 28, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 01/28 1:08 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. A status conference has been placed on calendar for February 17, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. Lead trial counsel shall appear. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY |
|
Friday, January 09, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order
Fri 01/09 2:02 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. See Order for details. (sw) |
|
Thursday, January 08, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
order
Transferring Case purs GO 14-03 (Related Case)(CV 34)
Thu 01/08 2:34 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV14-09600 RGK(SHx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton and Judge John A. Kronstadt to Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV14-09762 RGK (SHx). Signed by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (mg) |
|
19 | 19
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 01/08 1:48 PM
NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER. This matter has been transferred to the calendar of the Honorable R. Gary Klausner, United States District Judge. The parties are hereby notified that the reference to the ADR Program is VACATED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY |
|
Monday, January 05, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 01/06 1:42 PM
ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting13 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Felicia H. Ellsworth on behalf of Defendant Sony, designating David C. Marcus as local counsel. (lt) |
|
17 | 17
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 01/06 1:41 PM
ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting12 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William F. Lee on behalf of Defendant Sony, designating David C. Marcus as local counsel. (lt) |
|
Friday, January 02, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Fri 01/02 1:35 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc. answer now due 2/9/2015, filed by Defendant Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc..(Casamassima, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, December 30, 2014 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 12/30 1:32 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Defendant Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.s FRCP 7.1 And LR 7.1-1 Corporate Disclosure Statement And Notice Of Interested Parties) filed by Defendant Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc. (Marcus, David) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 12/30 12:45 PM
APPLICATION for attorney Felicia H. Ellsworth to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14983503 paid.) filed by Defendant Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc..(Marcus, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 12/30 12:01 PM
APPLICATION for attorney William F. Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14983035 paid.) filed by Defendant Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc..(Marcus, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, December 29, 2014 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Tue 12/30 1:08 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT. (See document for details) (bp) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Appearance
Mon 12/29 1:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David C Marcus on behalf of Defendant Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc. (Attorney David C Marcus added to party Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft))(Marcus, David) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Appearance
Mon 12/29 1:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher Thomas Casamassima on behalf of Defendant Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc. (Attorney Christopher Thomas Casamassima added to party Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft))(Casamassima, Christopher) |
|
Monday, December 22, 2014 | ||
9 | 9
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8)
Mon 12/22 10:31 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lwag) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18)
Mon 12/22 10:30 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton. (lwag) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 12/22 10:29 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc.. (lwag) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73)
Mon 12/22 10:16 AM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Western Division. Case has been assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Victor B. Kenton. New Case Number 2:14-cv-09762 JAK (VBKx). (lwag) |
|
Friday, December 19, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Steven Shapiro. (Fiske, John) | |
4 | 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Steven Shapiro. (Fiske, John) | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Steven Shapiro, identifying SONY PICTURES ENTERTAINMENT, INC.. (Fiske, John) | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Steven Shapiro. Related Case(s): 2:14-cv-09600-RGK-SH, 2:14-cv-09687-SVW-SH (Fiske, John) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-14953480 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Steven Shapiro. (Attorney John P Fiske added to party Steven Shapiro(pty:pla))(Fiske, John) |