California Northern District Court
Judge:Lucy H Koh
Referred: Paul Singh Grewal
Case #: 5:11-cv-02509
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:May 23, 2011
Terminated:Sep 02, 2015
Last checked: Thursday Sep 25, 2014 2:09 PM PDT
Appellant
Brad Greenspan
2995 Woodside Road, Suite 400
Woodside, CA 94062
Defendant
Apple Inc.
Represented By
Amanda R. Conley
O'Melveny And Myers
contact info
James Keith Rothstein
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Flora F Vigo
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Michael Frederick Tubach
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Victoria Leigh Weatherford
contact info
George A. Riley
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Robert Addy Van Nest
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Christina Joanne Brown
O'Melveny & Myers
contact info
George Riley
O'Melveny Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pixar
Represented By
Thomas A. Isaacson
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Deborah A. Garza
Covington And Burling LLP
contact info
Robert T. Haslam, III
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
John W. Nields, Jr.
Covington And Burling LLC
contact info
Jonathan A D Herczeg
Convington Burling LLP
contact info
Emily Johnson Henn
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Chinue Turner Richardson
contact info
Defendant
Google Inc.
Represented By
Eric Evans
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Daniel Edward Purcell
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Anne M Selin
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Donald M. Falk
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Edward D. Johnson
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Vincent J. Connelly
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Justina Kahn Sessions
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Sarah E Reynolds
Mayer Brown, LLP
contact info
Lee H. Rubin
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Robert Addy Van Nest
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Cody Shawn Harris
Keker And Van Nest LLP
contact info
Eugene Morris Paige
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Defendant
Adobe Systems Inc.
Represented By
Lin W. Kahn
Jones Day
contact info
Robert Allan Mittelstaedt
Jones Day
contact info
David Craig Kiernan
Jones Day
contact info
Craig Andrew Waldman
Jones Day
contact info
Robert Addy Van Nest
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Defendant
Intel Corp.
Represented By
John P Mittelbach
Munger Tolles Olson LLP
contact info
Sujal Shah
Bingham Mccutchen LLP
contact info
Bethany Woodard Kristovich
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Gregory M. Sergi
Munger, Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Robert Addy Van Nest
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Frank Hinman
Bingham Mccutchen LLP
contact info
Holly A. House
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Donn P. Pickett
Bingham Mccutchen , LLP
contact info
Frank H Busch
Bingham Mccutchen
contact info
Angela Marie Munoz
Bingham Mccutchen
contact info
Krystal N. Bowen
Bingham Mccutchen
contact info
Zachary J. Alinder
Bingham Mccutchen, LLP
contact info
Steven McCall Perry
Munger Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Bradley S. Phillips
Munger Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Gregory P. Stone
Munger Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Intuit Inc.
Represented By
Craig Ellsworth Stewart
Jones Day
contact info
Rowan Thomas Mason
Jones Day
contact info
Catherine Tara Zeng
Jones Day
contact info
Robert Allan Mittelstaedt
Jones Day
contact info
David Craig Kiernan
Jones Day
contact info
Roberta Diane Tonelli
Jones Day
contact info
Defendant
Lucasfilm Ltd.
Represented By
Paula Lenore Blizzard
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
John Watkins Keker
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Daniel Edward Purcell
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Thomas A. Isaacson
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Deborah A. Garza
Covington And Burling LLP
contact info
John W. Nields, Jr.
Covington And Burling LLC
contact info
Justina Kahn Sessions
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Cody Shawn Harris
Keker And Van Nest LLP
contact info
Emily Johnson Henn
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Chinue Turner Richardson
contact info
Eugene Morris Paige
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
In Re
Attorney Palm Inc.
Non-Parties Morgan Lewis & Bockius One Market, Spear Street
San Francisco, CA 94105
Represented By
Benjamin Patrick Smith
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Robert A. Nitsch, Jr.
Represented By
Jeffrey Benjamin Dubner
Cohen Milstein Sellers And Toll PLLC
contact info
Miscellaneous
Attorney Palm Inc.
Non-Parties Morgan Lewis & Bockius One Market, Spear Street
San Francisco, CA 94105
Represented By
Benjamin Patrick Smith
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
contact info
Movant
Christopher Donnelly
JK5048 301 Institution Drive
Bellefonte, PA 16823
Movant
Chris Eubank
Plaintiff
Brandon Marshall
Represented By
Katherine M Lehe
Law Foundation Of Silicon Valley
contact info
Kevin E. Rayhill
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.
contact info
Lisa Janine Cisneros
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann And Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Sarah Rebecca Schalman-Bergen
Berger And Montague, P.C.
contact info
Kevin Edward Rayhill
contact info
Joseph Peter Forderer
Leiff Cabraser Heimann Bernstein LLP
contact info
Eric L. Cramer
Berger & Montague, P.C.
contact info
James Gerard Beebe Dallal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm
contact info
Joshua P. Davis
University Of San Francisco School Of Law
contact info
Andrew Michael Purdy
Joseph Saveri Law Firm
contact info
Peter A. Barile, III
Grant & Eisenhofer, P.C.
contact info
Richard Martin Heimann
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein
contact info
John D. Radice
Grant & Eisenhofer P.A.
contact info
Eric B. Fastiff
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein,llp
contact info
Brendan Patrick Glackin
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Grant & Eisenhofer P.A.
contact info
Shanon Jude Carson
Berger & Montague, P.C.
contact info
Anne Brackett Shaver
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Dean Michael Harvey
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Kelly M. Dermody
Leiff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Joseph R. Saveri
Saveri Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Siddharth Hariharan
Represented By
Katherine M Lehe
Law Foundation Of Silicon Valley
contact info
Kevin E. Rayhill
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.
contact info
Lisa Janine Cisneros
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann And Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Sarah Rebecca Schalman-Bergen
Berger And Montague, P.C.
contact info
Kevin Edward Rayhill
contact info
Joseph Peter Forderer
Leiff Cabraser Heimann Bernstein LLP
contact info
Eric L. Cramer
Berger & Montague, P.C.
contact info
James Gerard Beebe Dallal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm
contact info
Joshua P. Davis
University Of San Francisco School Of Law
contact info
Andrew Michael Purdy
Joseph Saveri Law Firm
contact info
Peter A. Barile, III
Grant & Eisenhofer, P.C.
contact info
Richard Martin Heimann
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein
contact info
SuDarsana Srinivasan
Lieff Cabraser Heimann Bernstein LLP
contact info
John D. Radice
Grant & Eisenhofer P.A.
contact info
Eric B. Fastiff
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein,llp
contact info
Brendan Patrick Glackin
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Grant & Eisenhofer P.A.
contact info
Shanon Jude Carson
Berger & Montague, P.C.
contact info
Anne Brackett Shaver
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Dean Michael Harvey
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Kelly M. Dermody
Leiff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Joseph R. Saveri
Saveri Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Fichtner
Represented By
Katherine M Lehe
Law Foundation Of Silicon Valley
contact info
Kevin E. Rayhill
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.
contact info
Lisa Janine Cisneros
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann And Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Sarah Rebecca Schalman-Bergen
Berger And Montague, P.C.
contact info
Kevin Edward Rayhill
contact info
Joseph Peter Forderer
Leiff Cabraser Heimann Bernstein LLP
contact info
Eric L. Cramer
Berger & Montague, P.C.
contact info
James Gerard Beebe Dallal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm
contact info
Joshua P. Davis
University Of San Francisco School Of Law
contact info
Andrew Michael Purdy
Joseph Saveri Law Firm
contact info
Peter A. Barile, III
Grant & Eisenhofer, P.C.
contact info
Richard Martin Heimann
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein
contact info
SuDarsana Srinivasan
Lieff Cabraser Heimann Bernstein LLP
contact info
John D. Radice
Grant & Eisenhofer P.A.
contact info
Eric B. Fastiff
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein,llp
contact info
Brendan Patrick Glackin
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Grant & Eisenhofer P.A.
contact info
Shanon Jude Carson
Berger & Montague, P.C.
contact info
Anne Brackett Shaver
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Dean Michael Harvey
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Kelly M. Dermody
Leiff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Joseph R. Saveri
Saveri Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Stover
Represented By
Katherine M Lehe
Law Foundation Of Silicon Valley
contact info
Kevin E. Rayhill
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.
contact info
Lisa Janine Cisneros
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann And Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Sarah Rebecca Schalman-Bergen
Berger And Montague, P.C.
contact info
Kevin Edward Rayhill
contact info
Joseph Peter Forderer
Leiff Cabraser Heimann Bernstein LLP
contact info
Eric L. Cramer
Berger & Montague, P.C.
contact info
James Gerard Beebe Dallal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm
contact info
Joshua P. Davis
University Of San Francisco School Of Law
contact info
Andrew Michael Purdy
Joseph Saveri Law Firm
contact info
Peter A. Barile, III
Grant & Eisenhofer, P.C.
contact info
Richard Martin Heimann
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein
contact info
SuDarsana Srinivasan
Lieff Cabraser Heimann Bernstein LLP
contact info
John D. Radice
Grant & Eisenhofer P.A.
contact info
Eric B. Fastiff
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein,llp
contact info
Brendan Patrick Glackin
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Grant & Eisenhofer P.A.
contact info
Shanon Jude Carson
Berger & Montague, P.C.
contact info
Anne Brackett Shaver
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Dean Michael Harvey
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Kelly M. Dermody
Leiff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Joseph R. Saveri
Saveri Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
San Jose 150 Almaden Blvd., Ste 900
San Jose, CA 95113
Represented By
Anna Tryon Pletcher
Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Devine
Represented By
Kevin E. Rayhill
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.
contact info
Sarah Rebecca Schalman-Bergen
Berger And Montague, P.C.
contact info
James Gerard Beebe Dallal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm
contact info
Joshua P. Davis
University Of San Francisco School Of Law
contact info
Christina H Sharp
Girard Gibbs LLP
contact info
Peter A. Barile, III
Grant & Eisenhofer, P.C.
contact info
Richard Martin Heimann
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein
contact info
Brendan Patrick Glackin
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Grant & Eisenhofer P.A.
contact info
Shanon Jude Carson
Berger & Montague, P.C.
contact info
Daniel C. Girard
Girard Gibbs LLP
contact info
Kelly M. Dermody
Leiff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Katherine M Lehe
Law Foundation Of Silicon Valley
contact info
Elizabeth Antonia Kramer
Girard Gibbs LLP
contact info
Lisa Janine Cisneros
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann And Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Kevin Edward Rayhill
contact info
Joseph Peter Forderer
Leiff Cabraser Heimann Bernstein LLP
contact info
Eric L. Cramer
Berger & Montague, P.C.
contact info
SuDarsana Srinivasan
Lieff Cabraser Heimann Bernstein LLP
contact info
John D. Radice
Grant & Eisenhofer P.A.
contact info
Eric B. Fastiff
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein,llp
contact info
Lisa Jennifer Leebove
Joseph Saveri Law Firm
contact info
Anne Brackett Shaver
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Dean Michael Harvey
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Joseph R. Saveri
Saveri Law Firm
contact info

GPO Aug 04 2011
ORDER: That case numbers C-11-2509-SBA, C-11-3538-SBA, C-11-3539-SBA, C-11-3540-SBA and C-11-3541-SBA be TRANSFERRED to the San Jose Division re 35 Notice and 56 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 7/28/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011) Modified on 8/5/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
GPO Sep 12 2011
ORDER re 21 in 5:11-cv-03541-LHK: Adopting, as modified, Proposed Pretrial Order No. 1. Signed by Judge Koh on 9/12/2011. Case Numbers 11-CV-3538, 11-CV-3539, 11-CV-3540 and 11-CV-3541 are hereby CONSOLIDATED under MASTER FILE No. 11-CV-2509 LHK. All docket entries regarding the Consolidated Action shall be docketed under Master File Number 11-CV-2509. If a document pertains to only one or some of the consolidated cases, it will be docketed on the Master Docket with the notation in the docket text as to the case number(s) to which it pertains. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011) Modified text on 9/13/2011 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
GPO Sep 28 2011
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 66 Motion for Leave to File.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
GPO Jan 23 2012
ORDER Concerning Testifying Expert Discovery. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/23/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
GPO Jan 24 2012
ORDER Granting 105 Request to Bring Electronic Equipment into the Courtroom, filed by Apple Inc.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/24/12. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012) Modified text on 1/25/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
GPO Jan 24 2012
STIPULATION AND ORDER (MODIFIED BY THE COURT) re 95. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/24/12. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
GPO Apr 18 2012
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part (79) Motion to Dismiss; denying (83) Motion to Dismiss in case 5:11-cv-02509-LHK. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
GPO Apr 25 2012
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting (116) Motion to Relate Case in case 5:11-cv-02509-LHK. Related Case: 5:12-cv-1262-LHK (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012) Modified on 4/26/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
GPO May 24 2012
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying (134) Stipulation in case 5:11-cv-02509-LHK.Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02509-LHK, 5:11-cv-03538-LHK, 5:11-cv-03539-LHK, 5:11-cv-03540-LHK, 5:11-cv-03541-LHK, 5:12-cv-01262-LHK(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2012)
GPO May 29 2012
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying (137) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:11-cv-02509-LHK. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02509-LHK, 5:11-cv-03538-LHK, 5:11-cv-03539-LHK, 5:11-cv-03540-LHK, 5:11-cv-03541-LHK, 5:12-cv-01262-LHK(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
GPO Jun 04 2012
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting (144) Motion to Amend/Correct. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02509-LHK, 5:11-cv-03538-LHK, 5:11-cv-03539-LHK, 5:11-cv-03540-LHK, 5:11-cv-03541-LHK, 5:12-cv-01262-LHK(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2012)
GPO Jun 05 2012
Case Management Order; Referral of Discovery; Further Case Management Order. *** Counsel is advised that this Order contains new dates in addition to the dates discussed at the June 4, 2012 Case Management Conference.*** . Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/5/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
GPO Jun 15 2012
Stipulation and Order Regarding Amending Answers and Affirmative Defenses by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting (151) Stipulation in case 5:11-cv-02509-LHK. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02509-LHK, 5:11-cv-03538-LHK, 5:11-cv-03539-LHK, 5:11-cv-03540-LHK, 5:11-cv-03541-LHK, 5:12-cv-01262-LHK (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012) Modified text on 6/18/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
GPO Jul 02 2012
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 161 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
GPO Jul 02 2012
ORDER re Discovery. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/28/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
GPO Jul 02 2012
ORDER re Case Schedule. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/2/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
GPO Jul 10 2012
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting (175) Stipulation in case 5:11-cv-02509-LHK. Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02509-LHK, 5:11-cv-03538-LHK, 5:11-cv-03539-LHK, 5:11-cv-03540-LHK, 5:11-cv-03541-LHK, 5:12-cv-01262-LHK(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
GPO Jul 23 2012
ORDER to Show Cause Why Case No. 5:12-CV-01262-LHK Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/23/2012. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2012) Modified on 7/23/2012 (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF).
GPO Oct 11 2012
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 205 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
GPO Oct 17 2012
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting (207) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:11-cv-02509-LHK.Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02509-LHK, 5:11-cv-03538-LHK, 5:11-cv-03539-LHK, 5:11-cv-03540-LHK, 5:11-cv-03541-LHK(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
GPO Nov 21 2012
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying (213) Motion for Hearing; granting in part and denying in part (232) Motion ; granting (235) Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document in case 5:11-cv-02509-LHK (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
GPO Nov 21 2012
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 194 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jonathan A D Herczeg terminated.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
GPO Nov 26 2012
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 113 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Katerine M Lehe. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
GPO Jan 11 2013
ORDER Re: Motions to Seal. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/11/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
GPO Jan 15 2013
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part (186) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Related to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification; granting in part and denying in part (211) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Related to Defendants' Opposition to Class Certification; granting in part and denying in part (246) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Related to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Reply in Support of its Motion for Class Certification and Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike; granting (252) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portion of Glackin Letter; granting in part and denying in part (254) Defendants' Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:11-cv-02509-LHK (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2013)
GPO Jan 16 2013
ORDER TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO COURTROOM re 272 Notice (Other), filed by Intuit Inc.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/16/13. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
GPO Jan 25 2013
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting (310) Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document in case 5:11-cv-02509-LHK.Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02509-LHK, 5:11-cv-03538-LHK, 5:11-cv-03539-LHK, 5:11-cv-03540-LHK, 5:11-cv-03541-LHK, 5:12-cv-01262-LHK(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
GPO Feb 05 2013
ORDER REGARDING JOINT DISCOVERY STATUS REPORT TO THE COURT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/05/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
GPO Feb 20 2013
ORDER RE Privilege Logs. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/20/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
GPO Feb 28 2013
ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART SEALING MOTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 313 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 319 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 326 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 329 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 331 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 279 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
GPO Feb 28 2013
ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 278 Motion to Compel (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
GPO Mar 08 2013
ORDER RE: DEPOSITION OBJECTIONS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 8, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
GPO Mar 13 2013
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting (348) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:11-cv-02509-LHK for Nields.Associated Cases: 5:11-cv-02509-LHK, 5:11-cv-03538-LHK, 5:11-cv-03539-LHK, 5:11-cv-03540-LHK, 5:11-cv-03541-LHK, 5:12-cv-01262-LHK(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
GPO Mar 13 2013
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 13, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
GPO Mar 15 2013
ORDER RE: REDACTIONS FOR LACK OF RELEVANCE AND/OR RESPONSIVENESS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 15, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
GPO Mar 18 2013
ORDER RE: MARCH 15, 2013 STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 18, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
GPO Mar 29 2013
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 368 Motion for Leave to File.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
GPO Mar 29 2013
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 343 Motion for Leave to File Recent Decision.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
GPO Mar 29 2013
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 339 Motion for Leave to File Recent Decision.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
GPO Apr 01 2013
ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/01/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
GPO Apr 05 2013
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part (187) Motion to Certify Class; denying (210) Motion to Strike ; denying (263) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:11-cv-02509-LHK (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
GPO Apr 05 2013
ORDER RE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 5, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
GPO Apr 15 2013
ORDER Regarding April 12, 2013 Joint Discovery Status Report. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/15/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
GPO May 14 2013
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 370 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Robert T. Haslam, III terminated.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
GPO May 14 2013
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 371 Stipulation Regarding Document Admissibility and Authentication.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
GPO May 15 2013
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/15/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
GPO May 30 2013
ORDER RE: DISCOVERY STATUS REPORTS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on May 30, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
GPO Jul 14 2013
ORDER REGARDING JULY 12, 2013 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT LETTER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/14/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2013)
GPO Sep 30 2013
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part (307) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part (335) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part (346) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part (394) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part (271) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part (283) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:11-cv-02509-LHK (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
GPO Oct 24 2013
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 418 Motion to Certify Class (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
GPO Dec 16 2013
Order Vacating Notice Mailing Deadline. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/16/2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
GPO Dec 18 2013
Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/18/2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
GPO Jan 07 2014
Order Approving Revised Notice. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 01/07/2014. (Attachments: # (1) Revised Notice) (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
GPO Feb 10 2014
Order Expediting Briefing on 601 Administrative Motion to Enforce December 18, 2013 Case Management Order and Local Rule 7-11. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 02/10/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
GPO Feb 13 2014
Order Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/13/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
GPO Feb 24 2014
Order RE: Settlement Status Report. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/24/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
GPO Mar 10 2014
Order RE: Distribution of Argument on Pending Motions and Reminder Class Notice. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/10/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
GPO Apr 04 2014
ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh denying 556 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 557 Motion to Strike; denying 570 Motion to Exclude. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
GPO Apr 25 2014
Order Vacating Pretrial and Trial Dates and Setting Preliminary Approval Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/25/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
GPO Aug 08 2014
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 920 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Adobe, Apple, Google, and Intel. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
GPO Sep 04 2014
ORDER ON PROPOSED TRIAL SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 9/4/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
GPO Sep 05 2014
NOTICE OF CORRESPONDENCE TO THE COURT. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 9/5/14. (lhklc5, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
GPO Sep 08 2014
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 9/8/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
GPO Nov 18 2014
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 11/18/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
GPO Nov 26 2014
ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' SUR-SUR REPLY. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/26/2014. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
GPO Jan 30 2015
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 991 Administrative Motion to Unseal (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
GPO Mar 02 2015
Letter received by the Court from individual objecting to proposed Settlement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/2/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
GPO Mar 02 2015
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1037 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
GPO Mar 02 2015
ORDER SEALING TRANSCRIPT PORTION. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/2/2015. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
GPO Mar 03 2015
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 1032 Motion for Preliminary Approval (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
GPO Mar 03 2015
ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/3/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
GPO Mar 30 2015
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WITHDRAW LETTER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/30/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
GPO Jul 20 2015
ORDER TO FILE BILLING RECORDS SUPPORTING LODESTAR CALCULATION FOR THE JOSEPH R. SAVERI LAW FIRM, INC. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/20/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
GPO Sep 02 2015
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting (1087) Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
GPO Sep 02 2015
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part (1068) Motion for Attorney's Fees; granting in part and denying in part (1072) Motion for Attorney's Fees; granting in part and denying in part (1075) Motion for Attorney's Fees in case 5:11-cv-02509-LHK (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
GPO Sep 02 2015
FINAL JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/2/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015) **THE CLERK SHALL CLOSE THE CASE FILES** Modified on 9/3/2015 (sms, COURT STAFF).
GPO Nov 10 2016
Order Requiring Hourly Rate Justification for Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/10/16. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, November 09, 2017
1120 1120 misc Letter Fri 11/10 2:36 PM
Second Letter from Fitih M. Cinnor re1118 . (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2017)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2017
1119 1119 respoth Response Mon 11/06 9:56 AM
Response re1118 Letter and Status Report byMark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover.(Harvey, Dean) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Dean M. Harvey,
Att: 2 Declaration of Kenneth Jue