California Northern District Court
Judge:Phyllis J Hamilton
Case #: 4:13-cv-05413
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2013
Terminated:Mar 03, 2015
Last checked: Saturday Dec 27, 2014 5:37 PM PST
Defendant
Nick Steiner
Plaintiff
Automattic Inc.
Represented By
Joseph Charles Gratz
Durie Tangri LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Oliver Hotham
Represented By
Joseph Charles Gratz
Durie Tangri LLP
contact info

GPO Dec 20 2013
ORDER Denying Motion to Relate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/20/2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
GPO Oct 06 2014
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 22 MOTION for Default Judgment. Objections due by 10/20/2014. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on October 6, 2014. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
GPO Mar 02 2015
ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 22 Motion for Default Judgment; adopting 31 Report and Recommendations as to Motion for Default Judgment. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2015)

1. WordPress wins in court over fraudulent copyright takedown notices (venturebeat.com)
Submitted Mon 03/09/2015
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, March 03, 2015
39 39 misc Patent/Trademark Copy Tue 03/03 9:44 AM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding copyright infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 02, 2015
38 38 order Judgment Mon 03/02 2:11 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 3/2/2015. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
Related: [-]
37 37 order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Order on Report and Recommendations Mon 03/02 2:09 PM
ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 22 Motion for Default Judgment; adopting 31 Report and Recommendations as to Motion for Default Judgment. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 10, 2015
36 36 misc Status Report Tue 02/10 10:45 AM
STATUS REPORT Regarding Service of Report and Recommendation on Defendant by Automattic Inc., Oliver Hotham. (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 09, 2015
35 35 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Mon 02/09 10:37 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING DEADLINE TO FILE UPDATED STATUS REPORT. You are hereby notified that an updated status report shall be filed by February 11, 2015. Status Report due by 2/11/2015. (THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE)(napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 10, 2014
34 34 STATUS REPORT Regarding Service of Report and Recommendation on Defendant by Automattic Inc., Oliver Hotham. (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 07, 2014
33 33 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/7/14. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
Related: [-]
32 32 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/7/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 06, 2014
31 31 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 22 MOTION for Default Judgment. Objections due by 10/20/2014. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on October 6, 2014. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 27, 2014
30 30 Order, signed 8/27/14, by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 28 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2014)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 25, 2014
29 29 Declaration of Paul Sieminski in Support of22 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendant Nick Steiner filed byAutomattic Inc., Oliver Hotham. Related [+] (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
Related: [-] 22
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Exhibit O,
Att: 16 Exhibit P,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q
28 28 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Automattic Inc., Oliver Hotham.(Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Joseph C. Gratz ISO Motion to Seal,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Redacted Version of Supp. Decl. of Paul Sieminski ISO Motion for Default Judgment,
Att: 4 Unredacted Version of Supp. Decl. of Paul Sieminski ISO Motion for Default Judgment
27 27 Declaration of Oliver Hotham in Support of22 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendant Nick Steiner filed byAutomattic Inc., Oliver Hotham. Related [+] (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
Related: [-] 22
26 26 Declaration of Joseph C. Gratz in Support of22 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendant Nick Steiner filed byAutomattic Inc., Oliver Hotham. Related [+] (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
Related: [-] 22
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Friday, July 11, 2014
25 25 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/11/2014 before Joseph C. Spero re22 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to filed by Oliver Hotham, Automattic Inc. Supplemental declaration due within forty-five days from 7/11/14. Motion submitted. Related [+] (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/11/2014)
Related: [-] cording #FTR 9:39-9:47.
Tuesday, May 27, 2014
24 24 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to22 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court . Motion Hearing previously set for 6/27/14 at 9:30 AM has been re-set for 7/11/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Regardless of whether the Court reschedules the hearing date, all opposition and reply papers shall be timely filed pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-7(d). Any party seeking a continuance shall file a Motion and proposed Order. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this Notice . (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 23, 2014
23 23 CLERKS NOTICE. Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Default Judgment, therefore, the case management conference set for 5/23/14 at 2:00 PM, is taken off calendar. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this Notice (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 22, 2014
22 22 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to filed by Automattic Inc., Oliver Hotham. Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 6/5/2014. Replies due by 6/12/2014.(Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Joseph C. Gratz,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Decl. of Joseph C. Gratz,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Decl. of Joseph C. Gratz,
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Decl. of Joseph C. Gratz,
Att: 5 Exhibit D to Decl. of Joseph C. Gratz,
Att: 6 Declaration of Paul Sieminski,
Att: 7 Declaration of Oliver Hotham,
Att: 8 Proposed Order and Judgment
Tuesday, May 20, 2014
21 21 Clerks Notice: re ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to defendant Nick Steiner on 5/20/14. Related [+] (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
Related: [-] (s)20
Monday, May 19, 2014
20 20 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Automattic Inc., Oliver Hotham.(Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Joseph C. Gratz
Friday, May 16, 2014
19 19 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Automattic Inc., Oliver Hotham. (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2014
18 18 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER: Further Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/28/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2014
17 17 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/21/2014 before Joseph C. Spero. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Related [+] (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/21/2014)
Related: [-] cording #Not Reported.
Friday, February 14, 2014
16 16 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Automattic Inc., Oliver Hotham. (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2014
15 15 CLERKS NOTICE RE: TIME CHANGE. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/21/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. NOTE: Effective immediately case management and final pretrial conferences will now begin at 2:00 PM. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this Notice .(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2014
14 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Automattic Inc., Oliver Hotham. Nick Steiner served on 12/23/2013, answer due 1/13/2014. , CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Automattic Inc.; Oliver Hotham re7 Summons Issued(Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Friday, December 20, 2013
13 13 ORDER Denying Motion to Relate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/20/2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2013
12 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Automattic Inc., Oliver Hotham.. (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2013
11 11 Order, signed 12/11/13, by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 10 Motion To Enlarge Time to Serve Foreign Defendant.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2013
10 10 MOTION to Enlarge Time to Serve Foreign Defendant re1 Complaint,7 Summons Issued filed by Automattic Inc., Oliver Hotham. Responses due by 12/24/2013. Replies due by 12/31/2013.(Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Joseph C. Gratz,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Michael Hawkins,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Monday, December 09, 2013
9 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2013
8 8 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Copyrights Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
Related: [-]
7 7 Summons Issued as to Nick Steiner. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
Related: [-]
6 6 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/14/2014. Case Management Conference set for 2/21/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order
5 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Charles Gratz (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
Related: [-]
3 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Automattic Inc., Oliver Hotham (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
Related: [-]
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT for Copyrights Infringement; Jury Demand against Nick Steiner (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-8178672.). Filed by Automattic Inc., Oliver Hotham.(Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 11/21/2013) Modified on 11/21/2013 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet