Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Gregory A Presnell
Referred: Karla R Spaulding
Case #: 6:15-cv-00016
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2015
Terminated:Apr 27, 2015
Last checked: Monday Jul 06, 2015 9:16 AM EDT
Defendant
The Florida State University Board of Trustees
Represented By
Melissa W. Nelson
Mcguirewoods, Llp-Jacksonville
contact info
Carlos Genaro Muniz
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Scott S. Cairns
Mcguirewoods, Llp-Jacksonville
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
Represented By
Taylor Flanagan Ford
King, Blackwell, Zehnder & Wermuth, PA
contact info
David B. King
King, Blackwell, Zehnder & Wermuth, PA
contact info
Thomas A. Zehnder
King, Blackwell, Zehnder & Wermuth, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Erica Kinsman
Represented By
Taylor Flanagan Ford
King, Blackwell, Zehnder & Wermuth, PA
contact info
Baine Kerr
Hutchinson Black And Cook, LLC
contact info
Lauren E. Groth
Hutchinson Black And Cook, LLC
contact info
David B. King
King, Blackwell, Zehnder & Wermuth, PA
contact info
Thomas A. Zehnder
King, Blackwell, Zehnder & Wermuth, PA
contact info
John Clune
Hutchinson Black And Cook, LLC
contact info


1. FSU asks judge to toss Winston accuser suit (espn.go.com)
Submitted Wed 03/11/2015
2. Jameis Winston's accuser files federal lawsuit against FSU (collegefootballtalk.nbcsports.com)
Submitted Thu 01/08/2015
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 29, 2015
52 52 utility *Remark Wed 04/29 7:40 AM
Remark: Confirmation of case transfer to the Northern District of Florida; new case number 4:15-cv-235, filed 4/28/2015. (GJS)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 27, 2015
51 51 transfer District transfer out Mon 04/27 1:00 PM
TRANSFER to the District of Northern District of Florida (GJS)
Related: [-]
50 50 order Order on motion to transfer case Mon 04/27 11:19 AM
ORDER granting 23 Motion to transfer case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/27/2015. (ED)
Related: [-]