Lawon Exum v. Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | R Gary Klausner |
Referred: | Stephen J Hillman |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-00111 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Jan 06, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 02, 2015 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 04, 2015 6:46 AM PDT |
Defendant
Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lawon Exum
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, March 02, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Mon 03/02 2:30 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Lawon Exum. Dismissal is Without Prejudice.(Fiske, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, February 17, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 02/18 3:28 PM
MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge R. Gary Klausner: Case called. Court and counsel confer regarding motion to consolidate actions or filing of an amended complaint to include all parties. Counsel shall file an amended complaint on or before March 2, 2015. Defendants shall have 21 days to file a responsive pleading. The Rule 23g deadline for filing a class certification motion shall be filed within 90 days of the date the amended complaint is filed. Court Reporter: Sandra MacNeil. (pso) |
|
Monday, February 09, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Notice of Motion
Mon 02/09 8:57 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION re MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6)) 23 filed by Defendant Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/16/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Casamassima, Christopher) |
|
23 | 23
23
pgs
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Mon 02/09 8:55 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6)) filed by Defendant Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc..(Casamassima, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 03, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 02/04 8:53 AM
ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting21 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Noah A. Levine on behalf of Defendant Sony, designating David C. Marcus as local counsel. (lt) |
|
Friday, January 30, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 01/30 3:07 PM
APPLICATION for attorney Noah A. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15137984 paid.) filed by Defendant Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc..(Marcus, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, January 28, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 01/28 1:13 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. A status conference has been placed on calendar for February 17, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. Lead trial counsel shall appear. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY |
|
Friday, January 16, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order
Fri 01/16 4:11 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. See Order for details. (sw) |
|
18 | 18
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 01/16 3:21 PM
ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William F. Lee on behalf of Defendant Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc., designating David Marcus as local counsel. (pso) |
|
Thursday, January 15, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
order
Transferring Case purs GO 14-03 (Related Case)(CV 34)
Thu 01/15 2:30 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV14-09600 RGK (SHx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott and Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Stephen J. Hillman for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV15-00111 RGK (SHx). Signed by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (mg) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Thu 01/15 1:23 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION for attorney William F. Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15051862 paid.)14 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Motions and Related Filings >> Applications >> Appear Pro Hac Vice. Note: Wrong event does not provide relief or changes sought. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt) |
|
15 | 15
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 01/15 1:04 PM
NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER. This matter has been transferred to the calendar of the Honorable R. Gary Klausner, United States District Judge. The parties are hereby notified that the reference to the ADR Program is VACATED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY |
|
Wednesday, January 14, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 01/14 1:07 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for attorney William F. Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15051862 paid.) filed by Defendant Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc..(Marcus, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 13, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 01/13 4:36 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc. answer now due 2/9/2015, filed by Defendant Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc..(Casamassima, Christopher) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 01/13 4:25 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Defendant Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.'s FRCP 7.1 And LR 7.1-1 Corporate Disclosure Statement And Notice Of Interested Parties) filed by Defendant Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc. (Casamassima, Christopher) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Appearance
Tue 01/13 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David C Marcus on behalf of Defendant Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc. (Attorney David C Marcus added to party Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft))(Marcus, David) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Appearance
Tue 01/13 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher Thomas Casamassima on behalf of Defendant Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc. (Attorney Christopher Thomas Casamassima added to party Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft))(Casamassima, Christopher) |
|
Wednesday, January 07, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 01/07 11:25 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc. (mba) |
|
8 | 8
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8)
Wed 01/07 11:21 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (mba) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18)
Wed 01/07 11:20 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (mba) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73)
Wed 01/07 11:13 AM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Western Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to John E. McDermott. New Case Number 2:15-cv-00111 CAS (JEMx). (mba) |
|
Tuesday, January 06, 2015 | ||
5 | 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Lawon Exum. (Fiske, John) | |
4 | 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lawon Exum. (Fiske, John) | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lawon Exum, identifying SONY PICTURES ENTERTAINMENT, INC.. (Fiske, John) | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Lawon Exum. Related Case(s): 2:14-cv-09600-RGK-SH, 2:14-cv-09687-SVW-SH, 2:14-cv-09762-JAK-VBK (Fiske, John) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-15009647 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Lawon Exum. (Attorney John P Fiske added to party Lawon Exum(pty:pla))(Fiske, John) |