TOP SURE INVESTMENTS, INC v. MARCK PROPERTIES GROUP LLP et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Amy Berman Jackson |
Referred: | Alan Kay |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00048 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2015 |
Terminated: | May 25, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 12, 2015 8:40 AM EDT |
Defendant
BENJAMIN P SMITH
|
|
Defendant
WILLIAM L. JONES, LLC
|
|
Defendant
ROBERT A. MOORE, LLC
|
|
Defendant
MARCK PROPERTIES GROUP, LLP
|
|
Defendant
WILLIAM L. JONES
|
|
Defendant
WILLIAM L JONES LLC
|
|
Defendant
CLEARVIEW SETTLEMENT SOLUTIONS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ROBERT A MOORE LLC
|
|
Defendant
MRC INVESTMENTS LLC
|
|
Defendant
ROBERT A. MOORE
31 Triple Crown Court
North Potomac, MD 20878 |
|
Defendant
STEPHEN A METZ
|
|
Defendant
MARCK PROPERTIES GROUP LLP
|
|
Defendant
WILLIAM L JONES
|
|
Defendant
HARD MONEY BANKERS LLC
|
|
Defendant
HOLLY EDELSTEIN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TOP SURE INVESTMENTS, INC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TOP SURE INVESTMENTS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
BENJAMIN P. SMITH
Terminated: 02/11/2015
|
|
Defendant
MRC INVESTMENTS, LLC
Terminated: 02/11/2015
|
|
Defendant
STEPHEN A. METZ
Terminated: 02/11/2015
|
|
Defendant
HARD MONEY BANKERS, LLC
Terminated: 02/11/2015
|
|
Defendant
SHULMAN ROGERS GANDAL PORDY AND ECKER P.A.
Terminated: 01/14/2015
|
|
Defendant
DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA WATER AND SEWER AUTHORITY
Terminated: 02/11/2015
|
GPO
Jul 17 2015
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 29 Motion to Delay Entry of Default Judgment Damages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 7/17/15. (lcak1) |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 25, 2016 | ||
63 | 63
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Wed 05/25 2:41 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Plaintiff's52 Motion for Attorney Fees is hereby DENIED. Plaintiff's60 motion for a default judgment against William L. Jones and Robert A. Moore is hereby GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. A default judgment is hereby entered against William L. Jones in the following amounts: $106,878.31 in compensatory damages; $9,359.21 for interest up to the loan's maturity date, $16,576.59 in interest on the unpaid balance from the loan's maturity date until the date of this Order, post-judgment interest at the rate of 10% until the remaining debt is repaid, and $11,194.95 in attorneys' fees and costs. This judgment shall be satisfied jointly and severally by all defaulting defendants. The motion for a default judgment is DENIED IN PART as to Robert A. Moore, because any actions against him are stayed pending the resolution of his bankruptcy petition. See 11 U.S.C. § 362(a)(1). See Order for complete details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/25/2016. (lcabj3) |