Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Leonie M Brinkema
Referred: John F Anderson
Case #: 1:15-cv-00014
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2015
Last checked: Sunday Oct 04, 2015 8:11 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Architelos, Inc.
Represented By
Walter Drake Davis, Jr.
Davidson Berquist Jackson & Gowdey LLP
contact info
Alan Arthur Wright
H C Park & Associates PLC
contact info
James Thomas Wilson
Davidson Berquist Jackson & Gowdey LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Alexa Raad
Represented By
Walter Drake Davis, Jr.
Davidson Berquist Jackson & Gowdey LLP
contact info
Alan Arthur Wright
H C Park & Associates PLC
contact info
James Thomas Wilson
Davidson Berquist Jackson & Gowdey LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Afilias PLC
Represented By
Scott Alford Cunning
Haynes And Boone LLP
contact info
Defendant
Architelos, Inc.
Represented By
Walter Drake Davis, Jr.
Davidson Berquist Jackson & Gowdey LLP
contact info
Alan Arthur Wright
H C Park & Associates PLC
contact info
James Thomas Wilson
Davidson Berquist Jackson & Gowdey LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Afilias PLC
Represented By
Scott Alford Cunning
Haynes And Boone LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Alexa Raad
Terminated: 08/14/2015
Represented By
Walter Drake Davis, Jr.
Davidson Berquist Jackson & Gowdey LLP
contact info
Alan Arthur Wright
H C Park & Associates PLC
contact info
James Thomas Wilson
Davidson Berquist Jackson & Gowdey LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, March 23, 2016
292 292 order Order Wed 03/23 12:38 PM
ORDER: The defendant having filed a Suggestion of Bankruptcy [Dkt. No. 290] on March 23,2016, informing the Court that a Chapter 7 Bankruptcy petition was filed on its behalf in the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware on March 21, 2016, it is hereby ORDERED that all pending matters in this civil action, specifically the Plaintiffs Post-Trial Motion for a Permanent Injunction [Dkt. No. 255], be and are STAYED until any further order is issued by the Court. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/23/16. (yguy)
Related: [-]
291 291 23 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Wed 03/23 12:34 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION: For the reasons stated in open court, as more fully developed in this Memorandum Opinion, the Defendant's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial or Remittitur has been granted only to the extent that the judgment has been remitted to $2 million. This Memorandum Opinion accompanies the Order issued by this Court onJanuary 8, 2016. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/23/16. (yguy)
Related: [-]
290 290 misc Suggestion of Bankruptcy Wed 03/23 11:21 AM
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Architelos, Inc.. (Wright, Alan)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stayed Wed 03/23 12:43 PM
Case Stayed (yguy)
Related: [-]