Texas Northern District Court
Judge:A Joe Fish
Referred: Renee Harris Toliver
Case #: 3:15-cv-00220
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2015
Terminated:Feb 20, 2015
Last checked: Friday Jan 23, 2015 1:39 AM CST
Defendant
Dean Blandino
Defendant
Roger Goodell
Defendant
National Football League
Defendant
Gene Steratore
Plaintiff
Terry C Hendrix
#60828 Fremont Correctional Facility PO Box 999
Canon City, CO 81215

GPO Jan 26 2015
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: It is recommended that Plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis be DENIED, and that this action be DISMISSED as barred by the three-strike provision of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Such dismissal is with prejudice to the re-filing of an in forma pauperis lawsuit raising the same claims as herein presented, but without prejudice to the re-filing of this lawsuit with full payment of the $400.00 filing fee (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 1/26/2015) (mcrd)
GPO Feb 20 2015
ORDER ACCEPTING 7 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Given this conclusion, the plaintiff's 10 motion for legal supplies is also DENIED. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 2/20/2015) (twd)

1. Finally, a federal lawsuit over the Dez Bryant catch against Green Bay that wasn't (thescoopblog.dallasnews.com)
Submitted Fri 01/23/2015
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, February 20, 2015
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 02/20 1:20 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Objections to7 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE filed by Terry C Hendrix. (twd)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 02/20 1:18 PM
MOTION for an Order Directing the Clerk to Provide Plaintiff With All Requested Court Forms, Local Rules and File Stamped Copies of Everything File in Court filed by Terry C Hendrix. (twd)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Judgment Fri 02/20 12:29 PM
JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED as barred by the three-strike provision of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Such dismissal is with prejudice to the refiling of an in forma pauperis lawsuit raising the same claims as herein presented, but without prejudice to the refiling of this lawsuit with full payment of the $400.00 filing fee. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 2/20/2015) (twd)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations Fri 02/20 11:56 AM
ORDER ACCEPTING7 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Given this conclusion, the plaintiff's10 motion for legal supplies is also DENIED. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 2/20/2015) (twd)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Fri 02/20 12:29 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11, 12. Fri Feb 20 12:29:48 CST 2015 (crt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 04, 2015
10 10 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 02/05 3:54 PM
MOTION for Legal Supplies filed by Terry C Hendrix. (tlm)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/05 3:51 PM
Restricted Entry of Appearance filed by Terry C Hendrix. (tlm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 27, 2015
misc Order Receipt Tue 01/27 9:47 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7, 8. Tue Jan 27 09:47:37 CST 2015 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 26, 2015
8 8 order Order on Motion to Extend Time Tue 01/27 9:47 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: terminating as moot2 motion for an Order Granting Plaintiff to Move Before this Court in 35 Days in a Formal Manner, in light of the contemporaneous recommendation of the magistrate judge that this case be dismissed as barred by three strikes. In the event the district judge declines to accept the recommendation of the magistrate judge to dismiss this action, Plaintiff may re-urge his motion. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 1/26/2015) (mcrd)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Findings and Recommendations Tue 01/27 9:43 AM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: It is recommended that Plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis be DENIED, and that this action be DISMISSED as barred by the three-strike provision of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Such dismissal is with prejudice to the re-filing of an in forma pauperis lawsuit raising the same claims as herein presented, but without prejudice to the re-filing of this lawsuit with full payment of the $400.00 filing fee (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 1/26/2015) (mcrd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 22, 2015
6 6 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Thu 01/22 12:54 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (bdb)
Related: [-]
5 5 qcref Fish Thu 01/22 12:54 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. File to writ clerk/staff attorney. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (bdb)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Thu 01/22 12:55 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5, 6. Thu Jan 22 12:55:38 CST 2015 (crt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 21, 2015
4 4 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 01/22 12:41 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Terry C Hendrix. (bdb)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 01/22 12:39 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Terry C Hendrix. (bdb)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Extension of Time Thu 01/22 12:36 PM
MOTION for an Order Granting Plaintiffs to Move Before this Court in 35 Days in a Formal Manner filed by Terry C Hendrix. (bdb)
Related: [-]
1 1 2 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/22 12:31 PM
COMPLAINT against Dean Blandino, Roger Goodell, National Football League, Gene Steratore filed by Terry C Hendrix. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (bdb)
Related: [-]