California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Illston
Case #: 3:15-cv-00424
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2015
Terminated:Sep 02, 2015
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 28, 2015 6:49 AM PDT
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Priyanka Rajagopalan
contact info
Perlette Michele Jura
Gibson, Dunn Crutcher LLP
contact info
Joseph Friedman Tartakovsky
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Michael Li-Ming Wong
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
Represented By
Eric Francis Yuhl
Yuhl Carr LLP
contact info
Elizabeth J Chen
Wigdor LLP
contact info
Douglas H Wigdor
Wigdor LLP
contact info
Jeanne M Christensen
Wigdor LLP
contact info
Tanvir Haque Rahman
Wigdor LLP
contact info
Colin Andrew Yuhl
Yuhl Carr LLP
contact info

GPO Feb 23 2015
ORDER, Case reassigned to Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/23/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2015)
GPO Mar 24 2015
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/24/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
GPO Mar 25 2015
ORDER, Motions terminated: 18 MOTION Adjourn Initial Case Management Conference filed by Jane Doe. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2015 04:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/25/15. (Attachments: # (1) Standing Order)(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2015)
GPO May 19 2015
ORDER, 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time filed by Jane Doe. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Staying briefing on motions.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/19/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
GPO Jul 30 2015
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
GPO Sep 02 2015
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/1/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, September 02, 2015
52 52 order Order Dismissing Case Wed 09/02 10:21 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/1/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2015
51 51 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 09/01 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Jane Doe (Wigdor, Douglas) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
Related: [-]