R.M.B. et al v. Bedford County (Virginia) School Board et al
Virginia Western District Court | |
Judge: | Norman K Moon |
Referred: | Robert S Ballou |
Case #: | 6:15-cv-00004 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 03, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 11, 2016 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 12/19/2023 11:59 PM EST |
Friday, March 11, 2016 | ||
92 | 92
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document Order on Motion in Limine
Fri 03/11 2:20 PM
ORDER granting defendants'53 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying plaintiffs'76 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot plaintiffs'89 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document; and denying as moot plaintiffs'90 Motion in Limine. The case is hereby STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on March 11, 2016. (sfc) |
|
91 | 91
14
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Fri 03/11 2:14 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on March 11, 2016. (sfc) |
|
Tuesday, March 08, 2016 | ||
90 | 90
motion
In Limine
Tue 03/08 8:50 PM
MOTION in Limine by Linda Markham Bays, Robert Bruce Bays, R.M.B.. (Williams, Melvin) |
|
89 | 89
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 03/08 8:48 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion in Limine by Linda Markham Bays, Robert Bruce Bays, R.M.B..Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou.(Williams, Melvin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Motion in Limine, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit February 13, 2016 email to opposing counsel, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 04, 2016 | ||
87 | 87
minutes
Motion Hearing
Fri 03/04 11:16 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Norman K. Moon: Motion Hearing held on 3/4/2016 re76 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Linda Markham Bays, Robert Bruce Bays, R.M.B., and53 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by M.M. Calohan, Dr. Frederick M. Duis, Jr., Brian Wilson. (Court Reporter Carol Jacobs.) (ca) |