Tinsley et al v. Flanagan et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Roslyn O Silver |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-00185 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 03, 2015 |
Terminated: | Feb 12, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 02, 2015 5:39 AM MST |
Defendant
Gregory McKay
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thomas J Betlach
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cara M Christ
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Thomas Betlach
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Thomas Betlach
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Kupiszewski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margaret Tinsley
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Charles Flanagan
Terminated: 02/25/2015
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
William Humble
Terminated: 03/16/2015
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cory D Nelson
Terminated: 06/08/2015
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susan Brandt
Terminated: 04/20/2015
|
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit Accuses Arizona of Placing Foster Children in Jeopardy (wsj.com) |
Submitted Wed 02/04/2015 | |
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM MST |
Friday, July 07, 2023 | ||
562 | 562
![]() ORDER - IT IS ORDERED Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw Aaron Finch as Plaintiffs' Counsel (Doc.561 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 7/7/2023. (SLQ) |