Hicks et al v. PGA Tour, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-00489 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:1 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Feb 03, 2015 |
Terminated: | Feb 09, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 02, 2015 5:56 AM PDT |
Defendant
PGA Tour, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Achatz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandon Antus
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chad Antus
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Barnes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chris Berry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Bestor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Duane Bock
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Brooker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Carnes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steve Catlin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bruce Clendenen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Graeme Courts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Darby
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Henry Diana
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Don Donatello
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Doran
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Edmondson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dean Elliott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Etter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brent Everson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Micah Fugitt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Damon Green
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jay Haas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Hale
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Harms
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Hauser
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adam Hayes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Heim
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Michael Hicks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Jakovac
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tom Janis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jimmy Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chris Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nick Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steve Kay
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Knight
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shay Knight
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mitch Knox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kurtis Kowaluk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Levin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Limanti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brennen Little
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rich Mayo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Mazzeo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel McQuilken
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Meller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Minister
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Mohr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Todd Montoya
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tony Navarro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Nelson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Travis Perkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Pyland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Reed
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chad Reynolds
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Miguel Rivera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Sajtinac
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Sanders
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fred Sanders
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Corby Segal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shawn Segars
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Russel Stark
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brad Swearingen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Tesori
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Tway
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steve Underwood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Urbanek
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rusty Uresti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brett Waldman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Neil Wallace
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aaron Wark
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffery Willett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barry Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Yarbrough
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Justin York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John R. Adcox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Ambrosetti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Assante
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Bednarski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Norman R. Blount, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alan Bond
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harry Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John M. Buchna
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bob Burns
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenny Butler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Colin Byrne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Carrick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ladden Cline
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martin Courtois
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Russell Craver
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Crunden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jon Custer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Davidson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Dickerson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua E. Dickinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeff Dolf
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Duplantis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Egan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry R. Engleman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick V. Esway, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher S. Fiedler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Fletcher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tim Goodell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steve Greenwood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Hall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Hamilton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brent Henley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Calvin Henley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christian Heath Holt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Huber
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Jordan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David A. Kerr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kyle Kolenda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcel LaBas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Lawson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Damian Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Philip Lowe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Maroney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Greg W. Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin McArthur
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald McCann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert J. McFadden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allan Mellan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Middlemo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark E. Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard J. Motacki
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Todd Newcomb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David B. Parsons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Patterson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Poore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lewis B. Puller, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David H. Rawls
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chad Rosenak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard M. Schlaack
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Schlimm
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Schwarz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Spencer Seifert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John L. Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Spencer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Springer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linn Strickler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian H. Sullivan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy J. Thalmueller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jim Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth A. Tolles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry Travis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Tritton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Turning
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Vail
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Vanderriet
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Venn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael J. Waite
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Walters
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Weston Scott Watts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bradley Whittle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Wilds
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas G. Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward E. Willis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Woosley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walter Worthern, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Noah Zelnik
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Christian Heath Heath
Terminated: 03/16/2015
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Damon Lopez
Terminated: 03/16/2015
|
Represented By
|
1. | Williams joins caddies' lawsuit | Golf Channel (golfchannel.com) |
Submitted Tue 03/03/2015 | |
2. | Caddies' lawsuit against PGA challenges golf's gentlemanly veneer - The Globe and Mail (m.theglobeandmail.com) |
Submitted Wed 02/11/2015 | |
3. | Williams backs caddies in PGA Tour lawsuit (espn.go.com) |
Submitted Wed 02/11/2015 | |
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, October 24, 2018 | ||
125 | 125
![]() Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 124 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice.(knm, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
124 | 124
![]() MOTION to Dismiss filed by Matthew Achatz, John R. Adcox, Peter Ambrosetti, Brandon Antus, Chad Antus, George Assante, Andrew Barnes, Matthew Bednarski, Chris Berry, Michael Bestor, Norman R. Blount, Jr., Duane Bock, Alan Bond, David Brooker, Harry Brown, John M. Buchna, Bob Burns, Kenny Butler, Colin Byrne, Mark Carnes, Michael Carrick, Steve Catlin, Bruce Clendenen, Ladden Cline, Martin Courtois, Graeme Courts, Russell Craver, Mark Crunden, Jon Custer, Michael Darby, Andrew Davidson, Henry Diana, Robert Dickerson, Joshua E. Dickinson, Jeff Dolf, Don Donatello, Michael Doran, Joseph Duplantis, James Edmondson, John Egan, Dean Elliott, Terry R. Engleman, Patrick V. Esway, Jr., Joseph Etter, Brent Everson, Christopher S. Fiedler, Thomas Fletcher, Micah Fugitt, Tim Goodell, Damon Green, Steve Greenwood, Jay Haas, Steven Hale, Matthew Hall, Mark Hamilton, Kenneth Harms, Matthew Hauser, Adam Hayes, Christian Heath Heath, William Heim, Brent Henley, Calvin Henley, William Michael Hicks, Christian Heath Holt, Mark Huber, Jonathan Jakovac, Tom Janis, Jimmy Johnson, Chris Jones, Nick Jones, Peter Jordan, Steve Kay, David A. Kerr, Anthony Knight, Shay Knight, Mitch Knox, Kyle Kolenda, Kurtis Kowaluk, Marcel LaBas, David Lawson, Ronald Levin, John Limanti, Brennen Little, Damian Lopez, Damon Lopez, Philip Lowe, Michael Maroney, Greg W. Martin, Scott Martin, Andrew Martinez, Rich Mayo, Michael Mazzeo, Kevin McArthur, Ronald McCann, Robert J. McFadden, Daniel McQuilken, Allan Mellan, Eric Meller, Michael Middlemo, Mark E. Miller, Matthew Minister, Charles Mohr, Todd Montoya, Richard J. Motacki, Tony Navarro, Donald Nelson, Todd Newcomb, David B. Parsons, David Patterson, Travis Perkins, William Poore, Lewis B. Puller, III, Joseph Pyland, David H. Rawls, Brian Reed, Chad Reynolds, Miguel Rivera, David Robinson, Chad Rosenak, Scott Sajtinac, Andrew Sanders, Fred Sanders, Richard M. Schlaack, Daniel Schlimm, Eric Schwarz, Corby Segal, Shawn Segars, Spencer Seifert, Brian Smith, James Smith, John L. Smith, William Spencer, James Springer, Russel Stark, Linn Strickler, Brian H. Sullivan, Brad Swearingen, Paul Tesori, Timothy J. Thalmueller, Jim Thomas, Robert Thompson, Kenneth A. Tolles, Terry Travis, Matthew Tritton, Dennis Turning, Scott Tway, Steve Underwood, Mark Urbanek, Rusty Uresti, Robert Vail, Peter Vanderriet, John Venn, Michael J. Waite, Brett Waldman, Neil Wallace, James Walters, Aaron Wark, Weston Scott Watts, Bradley Whittle, Anthony Wilds, Jeffery Willett, Barry Williams, Stephen Williams, Thomas G. Williams, Edward E. Willis, David Woosley, Walter Worthern, Jr., John Yarbrough, Justin York, Noah Zelnik. Responses due by 11/6/2018. Replies due by 11/13/2018.(Cirsch, Lee) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |