New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lewis A Kaplan
Referred: Frank Maas
Case #: 1:15-cv-00986
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2015
Terminated:Dec 18, 2015
Last checked: Monday Aug 10, 2015 9:02 AM EDT
ADR Provider
King & Spalding LLP
1185 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036
Represented By
Philip Russell Forlenza
Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Vringo Inc.
Represented By
Karl Geercken
Alston & Bird, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Amber Wessels-Yen
Alston & Bird, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Brian E. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Michael J. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Vringo Infrastucture Inc.
Represented By
Karl Geercken
Alston & Bird, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Amber Wessels-Yen
Alston & Bird, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Brian E. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Michael J. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
ZTE CORPORATION
Represented By
Mary Matterer
Morris James LLP
contact info
Nicole S. Cunningham
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info
Jeffrey John Catalano
Brinks Gilson & Lione
contact info
Steven Arthur Moore
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info
Richard K. Herrmann
Morris James LLP
contact info
Charles Moran McMahon
Brinks Hofer Gilson & Lione
contact info
Brian Andrew Jones
Mcdermott, Will & Emery, Llp (chicago)
contact info
Paul A. Straus
King & Spalding Llp (nyc)
contact info
Alexander Paul Ott
Mcdermott Will & Emery
contact info
Jay H Reiziss
Mcdermott Will & Emery
contact info
Defendant
Vringo Inc.
Represented By
Amanda Michelle Waide
Alston & Bird Llp (ga)
contact info
Charles Patrick Kennedy
Lerner, David, Littenberg, Krumholz & Mentlik, LLP
contact info
Karl Geercken
Alston & Bird, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Amber Wessels-Yen
Alston & Bird, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Mark A. McCarty
Alston & Bird, L.L.P.
contact info
Brian E. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Michael J. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Defendant
Vringo Infrastucture Inc.
Represented By
Amanda Michelle Waide
Alston & Bird Llp (ga)
contact info
Charles Patrick Kennedy
Lerner, David, Littenberg, Krumholz & Mentlik, LLP
contact info
Karl Geercken
Alston & Bird, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Amber Wessels-Yen
Alston & Bird, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Mark A. McCarty
Alston & Bird, L.L.P.
contact info
Brian E. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Michael J. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ZTE CORPORATION
Represented By
Mary Matterer
Morris James LLP
contact info
Nicole S. Cunningham
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info
Jeffrey John Catalano
Brinks Gilson & Lione
contact info
Steven Arthur Moore
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info
Richard K. Herrmann
Morris James LLP
contact info
Charles Moran McMahon
Brinks Hofer Gilson & Lione
contact info
Jeff Edward Butler
contact info
Brian Andrew Jones
Mcdermott, Will & Emery, Llp (chicago)
contact info
Paul A. Straus
King & Spalding Llp (nyc)
contact info
Alexander Paul Ott
Mcdermott Will & Emery
contact info
Jay H Reiziss
Mcdermott Will & Emery
contact info

Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 19, 2017
221 221 misc Sealed Document Disposed Tue 09/19 11:02 AM
SEALED MATERIALS DISPOSED: Document(s) 60, 105, 106 and 201 were destroyed since the filing party did not retrieve the material(s) within 30 days of the date indicated. The sealed record(s) were destroyed on 09/19/2017.(mps)
Related: [-]