New Mexico District Court
Judge:M Christina Armijo
Referred: Steven C Yarbrough
Case #: 1:15-cv-00141
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2015
Terminated:Jun 23, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 18, 2015 7:55 AM MDT
Defendant
The University Of New Mexico Board Of Regents
Defendant
University of New Mexico Board of Regents
Represented By
Leah M Stevens-Block
Sheehan & Sheehan, P.A.
contact info
Quentin Smith
contact info
Plaintiff
Courtney D Spencer
Represented By
Lisa P. Ford
Lisa P. Ford, Attorney At Law, P.C.
contact info
Brad D. Hall
Law Office Of Brad D. Hall
contact info

GPO Jan 11 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo denying 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 8 Memorandum in Support. (caw)

1. Lawsuit: UNM Interfered With Gang Rape Case Involving Football Players (deadspin.com)
Submitted Tue 02/24/2015
2. Lawsuit: UNM botched rape investigation (dailylobo.com)
Submitted Fri 02/20/2015
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Thursday, June 23, 2016
54 54 2 pgs Stipulated ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo granting53 Motion to Dismiss (vv)
Related: [-]
53 53 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by University of New Mexico Board of Regents. (Smith, Quentin)
Related: [-]