California Northern District Court
Judge:Phyllis J Hamilton
Case #: 4:15-cv-00760
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2015
Terminated:Dec 07, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 18, 2015 6:39 AM PDT
Defendant
Gigabyte Global Business Corporation
Represented By
Judy Kwan
Orrick, Herrington And Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Stephen Michael Knaster
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
James Neil Kramer
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Alexander K Talarides
Orrick Herrington And Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Robert P. Varian
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Defendant
G.B.T. Inc.
Represented By
Stephen Michael Knaster
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Robert P. Varian
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Defendant
EVGA Corporation
Represented By
Stephen Michael Knaster
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Robert P. Varian
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Defendant
ASUS Computer International
Represented By
Stephen Michael Knaster
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Robert P. Varian
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Defendant
NVIDIA Corporation
Represented By
Judy Kwan
Orrick, Herrington And Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Stephen Michael Knaster
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
James Neil Kramer
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Alexander K Talarides
Orrick Herrington And Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Robert P. Varian
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Stephen Denz
Represented By
Alan M. Mansfield
Whatley Kallas, LLP
contact info
Jonas Palmer Mann
Audet & Partners LLP
contact info
William M. Audet
Audet & Partners, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Timothy Farley
Represented By
Jonas Palmer Mann
Audet & Partners LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Alexander Montgomery
Represented By
Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Jonas Palmer Mann
Audet & Partners LLP
contact info
Movant
Pedro Santiago
Represented By
Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Neal J Deckant
Bursor And Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephen Denz
Represented By
Alan M. Mansfield
Whatley Kallas, LLP
contact info
Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
William M. Audet
Audet & Partners, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kiloe Young
Represented By
Alan M. Mansfield
Whatley Kallas, LLP
contact info
Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Jeff S. Westerman
Westerman Law Corp
contact info
William James Doyle, II
Doyle Lowther LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Vorraso
Represented By
Alan M. Mansfield
Whatley Kallas, LLP
contact info
Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Andy Torrales
Represented By
Alan M. Mansfield
Whatley Kallas, LLP
contact info
Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Dylan Jordan
Represented By
Alan M. Mansfield
Whatley Kallas, LLP
contact info
Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy Farley
Represented By
Alan M. Mansfield
Whatley Kallas, LLP
contact info
Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
William M. Audet
Audet & Partners, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kyle Ellis
Represented By
Alan M. Mansfield
Whatley Kallas, LLP
contact info
Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
David Dropski
Represented By
Alan M. Mansfield
Whatley Kallas, LLP
contact info
Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Doerrer
Represented By
Samuel Lasser
Law Office Of Samuel Lasser
contact info
Alan M. Mansfield
Whatley Kallas, LLP
contact info
Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Ryan Brenek
Represented By
Alan M. Mansfield
Whatley Kallas, LLP
contact info
Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrew Ostrowski
Represented By
Alan M. Mansfield
Whatley Kallas, LLP
contact info
Joe R. Whatley, Jr.
Whatley Kallas LLP
contact info
Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Dennis George Pantazis, Jr
Wiggins Childs Pantazis Fisher Goldfarb LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Austin Verlinden
Represented By
Alan M. Mansfield
Whatley Kallas, LLP
contact info
Alan R. Plutzik
Bramson Plutzik Mahler & Birkhaeuser, LLP
contact info
Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Roushion
Represented By
Alan M. Mansfield
Whatley Kallas, LLP
contact info
Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Laurence D. King
Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Paolo Rodriguez
Represented By
Alan M. Mansfield
Whatley Kallas, LLP
contact info
Alan R. Plutzik
Bramson Plutzik Mahler & Birkhaeuser, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Paolo Jimenez
Represented By
Alan M. Mansfield
Whatley Kallas, LLP
contact info
Alan R. Plutzik
Bramson Plutzik Mahler & Birkhaeuser, LLP
contact info
Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Joel Bernabel
Represented By
Alan M. Mansfield
Whatley Kallas, LLP
contact info
Alan R. Plutzik
Bramson Plutzik Mahler & Birkhaeuser, LLP
contact info
Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info

GPO Apr 10 2015
nt Counsel . Motions to appoint interim counsel due by 4/10/2015.Responses due by 4/24/2015. Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/10/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2015)ORDER granting 40 STIPULATION to set Schedule for Applications for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel and Extend Deadline to file Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Stephen Denz. Reset Deadlines as to 29 MOTION to Appoi
GPO Apr 23 2015
*** DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #58 for correct order re dates *** ORDER, granting 52 STIPULATION re 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines filed by Andrew Ostrowski. Case Management Statement due by 6/29/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/23/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
GPO Apr 23 2015
ORDER re 54 Stipulation to consolidate C-15-1800 as part of the In re NVIDIA GTX 970 Graphics Chip Litigation Case no. C-15-0760CRB filed by Timothy Farley, Alexander Montgomery. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/23/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
GPO Apr 23 2015
CORRECTED ORDER re 52 STIPULATION re 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines filed by Andrew Ostrowski Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/23/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
GPO Jul 02 2015
ORDER granting 71 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 67 Amended Complaint, filed by NVIDIA Corporation, Gigabyte Global Business Corporation, ASUS Computer International. Responses to any Rule 12 motions due by 8/14/2015. Replies due by 9/4/2015. Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/1/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
GPO Jul 31 2015
ORDER granting 80 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File second Amended Consolidated Complaint and to Take Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Off Calendar filed by Timothy Farley, Paolo Jimenez, David Dropski, Stephen Denz, Ryan Brenek, Jason Doerrer, Joel Bernabel, Kyle Ellis. Second Amended Consolidated Complaint due by 9/14/2015. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/31/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
GPO Aug 31 2015
SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES 5:15-cv-03428 NC, Dye v Nvidia and 3:15-cv-00760 CRB, In Re: Nvidia GTX 970 Graphics Chip Litigation. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/31/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
GPO Sep 08 2015
ORDER granting 84 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 77 Clerk's Notice, For Order Changing Date of Case Management Conference & Other Pre-Trial Deadlines filed by Paolo Jimenez, et al. Case Management Statement due by 11/17/2015. Case Management Conference reset for 11/20/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/4/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2015)
GPO Dec 21 2015
ORDER re status conference statement. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 12/21/2015. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
GPO Dec 23 2015
Amended order re status conference statement. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 12/23/2015. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
GPO Jun 14 2016
ORDER re 124 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER, VACATING SCHEDULE REGARDING DEFENDANTS' 114 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 06/14/2016. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)

1. Nvidia hit with class-action lawsuit over graphics card RAM issues (arstechnica.com)
Submitted Mon 02/23/2015
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, August 30, 2021
150 150 misc Letter Wed 09/01 6:18 PM
Letter to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton re Report on Rose Foundation, from Tim Little, dated 08/25/21. (jlmS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]