California Southern District Court
Judge:Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referred: Ruben B Brooks
Case #: 3:15-cv-00368
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1391 Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2015
Terminated:Jun 23, 2015
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 18, 2015 7:29 AM PDT
Defendant
Lenovo (United States), Inc.
Defendant
Superfish, Inc.
Represented By
Rodger R Cole
Fenwick & West LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lenovo Group Limited
Plaintiff
Jessica N. Bennett
Represented By
Natasha A Naraghi
Law Offices Of Alexander M. Schack
contact info


1. Lenovo slapped with lawsuit over dangerous Superfish adware (pcworld.com)
Submitted Mon 02/23/2015
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, June 24, 2015
14 14 misc Transfer Letter Received Thu 06/25 11:28 AM
Transfer Letter Received from Northern District of CA. Case number in other court is 5:15-cv-02784 (kas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2015
13 13 order Case Transferred Out - District FORM Wed 06/24 1:41 PM
Case transferred to the Northern District of California pursuant to MDL No. 2624, Transfer Order. Files transferred electronically to: *District of California, Northern*. (kas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transfer Order
Monday, April 27, 2015
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 04/27 10:43 AM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint (Doc. No.11 ). The parties' joint motion for an extension of time (Doc. No.11 ) is granted. Defendants shall respond to the amended complaint no later than 45 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues an order deciding the motion to transfer the In re Lenovo Adware Litigation cases (MDL No. 2624) for coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407 (the MDL Motion), or as otherwise ordered by the MDL transferee court if the MDL Motion is granted. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 4/27/2015. (cxl)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2015
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 04/24 10:11 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Superfish, Inc.. (Cole, Rodger)Attorney Rodger R Cole added to party Superfish, Inc.(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 14, 2015
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/14 1:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica N. Bennett. Lenovo Group Limited served.(Naraghi, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Return Registered Receipt
Tuesday, April 07, 2015
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/07 12:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica N. Bennett. Superfish, Inc. served. (Naraghi, Natasha) (cxl)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 23, 2015
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 03/23 11:14 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jessica N. Bennett, as to Lenovo (United States), Inc.. (Naraghi, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 16, 2015
7 7 service Summons Issued Mon 03/16 9:51 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jpp)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 13, 2015
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 03/13 11:06 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Jessica N. Bennett.New Summons Requested. (Naraghi, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration
Friday, March 06, 2015
5 5 notice Notice of MDL Filing Fri 03/06 3:23 PM
NOTICE of MDL Filing: Motion for Transfer of Actions to the Eastern District of North Carolina Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1407 for Consolidated or Coordinated Pretrial Proceedings, Memorandum of Law, Schedule of Actions w/Exhibit 1, Proof of Service by Plaintiff Lukas Pick (kas)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 23, 2015
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/23 1:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica N. Bennett. Superfish, Inc. served. (Naraghi, Natasha)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/23 1:27 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica N. Bennett. Lenovo (United States), Inc. served. (Naraghi, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 20, 2015
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 02/20 9:51 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (acc)(jrd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 19, 2015
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/20 9:49 AM
COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against Lenovo (United States), Inc., Superfish, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-7823419.), filed by Jessica N. Bennett. The new case number is 3:15-cv-00368-CAB-RBB. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case. (Naraghi, Natasha)(acc)(jrd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet