Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Referred: K Nicole Mitchell
Case #: 6:15-cv-00145
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2015
Terminated:May 13, 2020
Last checked: Monday Aug 24, 2015 8:58 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
Apple Inc.
Represented By
Brett Stephen Rosenthal
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher Llp - Dallas
contact info
Robert Anthony Vincent
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher Llp - Dallas
contact info
Jennifer J Rho
Gibson Dunn Crutcher Llp - Los Angeles
contact info
Brian M Buroker
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher Llp - Washington
contact info
H Mark Lyon
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher Llp - Palo Alto
contact info
Tracey B Davies
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
William B Dawson
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher Llc - Dallas
contact info
Melissa Richards Smith
Gillam & Smith, LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Smartflash LLC
Represented By
Jason Scott McManis
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
John Franklin Summers
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
John Austin Curry
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Hamad M Hamad
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Christopher S Stewart
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Warren Joseph McCarty, III
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Daniel R Pearson
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Bradley Wayne Caldwell
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Jason Dodd Cassady
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Justin Thomas Nemunaitis
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Smartflash Technologies Limited
Represented By
Jason Scott McManis
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
John Franklin Summers
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
John Austin Curry
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Hamad M Hamad
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Christopher S Stewart
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Warren Joseph McCarty, III
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Daniel R Pearson
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Bradley Wayne Caldwell
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Jason Dodd Cassady
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Justin Thomas Nemunaitis
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Defendant
Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014
Represented By
Brett Stephen Rosenthal
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher Llp - Dallas
contact info
Robert Anthony Vincent
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher Llp - Dallas
contact info
Jennifer J Rho
Gibson Dunn Crutcher Llp - Los Angeles
contact info
Brian M Buroker
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher Llp - Washington
contact info
H Mark Lyon
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher Llp - Palo Alto
contact info
Tracey B Davies
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
William B Dawson
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher Llc - Dallas
contact info
Melissa Richards Smith
Gillam & Smith, LLP
contact info
Petitioner
Smartflash Technologies Limited
Represented By
Bradley Wayne Caldwell
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Smartflash LLC
Represented By
Jack Wesley Hill
Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC
contact info
Claire Abernathy Henry
Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC
contact info
Hamad M Hamad
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Christopher S Stewart
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Daniel R Pearson
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Bradley Wayne Caldwell
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Jason Dodd Cassady
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Justin Thomas Nemunaitis
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Thomas John Ward, Jr
Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC
contact info
Jason Scott McManis
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
John Franklin Summers
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
John Austin Curry
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Warren Joseph McCarty, III
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Smartflash Technologies Limited
Represented By
Jack Wesley Hill
Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC
contact info
Claire Abernathy Henry
Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC
contact info
Hamad M Hamad
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Christopher S Stewart
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Daniel R Pearson
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Bradley Wayne Caldwell
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Jason Dodd Cassady
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Justin Thomas Nemunaitis
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Thomas John Ward, Jr
Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC
contact info
Jason Scott McManis
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
John Franklin Summers
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
John Austin Curry
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Warren Joseph McCarty, III
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info

Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, June 11, 2020
43 43 notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Thu 06/11 9:26 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) after termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (mll, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 13, 2020
42 42 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 05/13 9:13 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant in the above-styled lawsuit are DISMISSED AS MOOT. Defendant's counterclaims against Plaintiff in the above-styled lawsuit are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees related to the above-styled lawsuit. The Clerk shall close this case. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 05/13/20. (mll, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 08, 2020
41 41 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 05/08 4:22 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Case by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 01, 2020
40 40 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 05/01 1:08 PM
ORDER granting39 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to file a status report is hereby extended by one-week to May 8, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 5/1/2020. (gsg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 30, 2020
39 39 motion Extension of Time to File Thu 04/30 3:55 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited.(Caldwell, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 21, 2020
38 38 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/21 12:59 PM
ORDER FOR STATUS. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 4/21/2020. (gsg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2017
37 37 notice Notice (Other) Thu 06/22 11:33 AM
NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Relevant Determination from Related Proceedings(Dawson, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Federal Circuit Mandate in Appeal No. 16-1059
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Federal Circuit Opinion in Appeal No. 16-1059
Tuesday, July 19, 2016
36 36 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 07/19 2:53 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Claire Abernathy Henry (Henry, Claire)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 27, 2015
35 35 order Order Staying Case Mon 07/27 4:51 PM
ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 07/27/15. (mll, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 21, 2015
34 34 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 07/21 11:59 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tracey B Davies on behalf of Apple Inc. (Davies, Tracey)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 07/21 11:53 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Stephen Rosenthal on behalf of Apple Inc. (Rosenthal, Brett)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 07/21 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Anthony Vincent on behalf of Apple Inc. (Vincent, Robert)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 07/21 11:47 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer J Rho on behalf of Apple Inc. (Rho, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 07/21 11:46 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by H Mark Lyon on behalf of Apple Inc. (Lyon, H)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 07/21 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian M Buroker on behalf of Apple Inc. (Buroker, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 16, 2015
28 28 notice Notice (Other) Thu 07/16 10:12 PM
NOTICE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R. 3-1 AND P.R. 3-2 (Caldwell, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 07, 2015
27 27 order Order Tue 07/07 4:45 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/7/2015. (gsg)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 07/09 9:07 AM
Scheduling Conference set for 7/30/2015 AT 01:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne. (gsg)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 07/09 9:07 AM
Scheduling Conference set for 7/30/2015 AT 01:30 PM in Marshall before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne. (gsg)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 05, 2015
26 26 notice Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference Fri 06/05 3:46 PM
NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Caldwell, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 18, 2015
25 25 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 05/18 5:42 PM
ANSWER to21 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited.(Caldwell, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 05, 2015
24 24 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 05/05 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Hill, Jack)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 05/05 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Henry, Claire)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 05/05 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Ward, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2015
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 04/24 10:32 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Apple Inc..(Dawson, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 31, 2015
text Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Tue 03/31 1:28 PM
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc. to 4/24/2015. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 30, 2015
20 20 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Mon 03/30 3:59 PM
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc..( Dawson, William)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 03/30 3:56 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William B Dawson on behalf of Apple Inc. (Dawson, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 23, 2015
18 18 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 03/23 3:26 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Apple Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2015
17 17 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Wed 03/18 6:33 AM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. (Caldwell, Bradley)
Related: [-]
text Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Wed 03/18 9:10 AM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc. to 4/9/2015. 21 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 11, 2015
16 16 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 03/11 6:51 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Warren Joseph McCarty, III on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (McCarty, Warren)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 03/11 6:50 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Scott McManis on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (McManis, Jason)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 03/11 6:49 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Franklin Summers on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Summers, John)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 03/11 6:46 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher S Stewart on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Stewart, Christopher)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 03/11 6:45 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Thomas Nemunaitis on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Nemunaitis, Justin)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 03/11 6:44 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hamad M Hamad on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Hamad, Hamad)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 03/11 6:42 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel R Pearson on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Pearson, Daniel)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 03/11 6:41 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Austin Curry on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Curry, John)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 03/11 6:39 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Dodd Cassady on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Cassady, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 03, 2015
7 7 service Return of Service Executed Tue 03/03 2:25 PM
Return of Service Executed as to Apple Inc. on 2/26/2015, by personal service; answer due: 3/19/2015. (mll, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 26, 2015
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 02/26 1:23 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 25, 2015
5 5 notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Wed 02/25 9:53 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Caldwell, Bradley)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Jury Demand Wed 02/25 9:51 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/25 9:50 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Smartflash Technologies Limited (Caldwell, Bradley)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/25 9:49 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Smartflash LLC (Caldwell, Bradley)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/25 9:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5075317.), filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited.(Caldwell, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 02/26 12:18 PM
Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell added. (mll, )
Related: [-]