Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Robert N Scola, Jr
Case #: 1:15-cv-20876
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1346 Tort Claim
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2015
Terminated:Mar 16, 2015
Last checked: Sunday Aug 30, 2015 10:42 AM EDT
Defendant
LUMBER LIQUIDATORS HOLDINGS, INC.
a Delaware corporation 3000 John Deere Road
Toano, VA 23168
Defendant
LUMBER LIQUIDATORS LEASING, LLC
a Delaware limited liability corporation 3000 John Deere Road
Toano, VA 23168
Defendant
LUMBER LIQUIDATORS SERVICES, LLC
a Delaware limited liability corporation 3000 John Deere Road
Toano, VA 23168
Defendant
LUMBER LIQUIDATORS, INC.
a Delaware corporation 3000 John Deere Road
Toano, VA 23168
Defendant
Lumber Liquidators Holdings, Inc.
a Delaware corporation 3000 John Deere Road
Toano, VA 23168
Represented By
Emily Yandle Rottmann
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Nathan W Hill
Gunster Yoakley And Stewart
contact info
Robert Eric Bilik
Mcguire Woods
contact info
David Richardson Atkinson, Jr.
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Defendant
Lumber Liquidators Leasing, LLC
a Delaware limited liability corporation 3000 John Deere Road
Toano, VA 23168
Represented By
Emily Yandle Rottmann
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Nathan W Hill
Gunster Yoakley And Stewart
contact info
Robert Eric Bilik
Mcguire Woods
contact info
David Richardson Atkinson, Jr.
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Defendant
Lumber Liquidators Services, LLC
a Delaware limited liability corporation 3000 John Deere Road
Toano, VA 23168
Represented By
Emily Yandle Rottmann
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Nathan W Hill
Gunster Yoakley And Stewart
contact info
Robert Eric Bilik
Mcguire Woods
contact info
David Richardson Atkinson, Jr.
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Defendant
Lumber Liquidators, Inc.
a Delaware corporation 3000 John Deere Road
Toano, VA 23168
Represented By
Emily Yandle Rottmann
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Nathan W Hill
Gunster Yoakley And Stewart
contact info
Robert Eric Bilik
Mcguire Woods
contact info
David Richardson Atkinson, Jr.
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
Plaintiff
JOAQUIN F BADIAS
Represented By
Theodore Babbitt
Babbitt Johnson & Osborne
contact info
John Marion Quaranta
Weil Quaranta, P.A.
contact info
Wendi Leigh Ribaudo
Weil Quaranta, P.A.
contact info
Ronald Peter Weil
Ronald Weil PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Joaquin F Badias
Represented By
Theodore Babbitt
Babbitt Johnson & Osborne
contact info
John Marion Quaranta
Weil Quaranta, P.A.
contact info
Wendi Leigh Ribaudo
Weil Quaranta, P.A.
contact info
Ronald Peter Weil
Ronald Weil PA
contact info


1. Lumber Liquidators class-action lawsuit filed in Miami (local10.com)
Submitted Thu 03/05/2015
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, June 15, 2015
26 26 order MDL Conditional Transfer Order Mon 06/15 2:52 PM
Certified TRANSFER ORDER (TO-dated 6/12/2015) transferring case to the Eastern District of Virginia re: MDL 2627 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Anthony J. Trenga. (Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair of the Panel). (gp)
Related: [-]
25 25 order MDL Conditional Transfer Order Mon 06/15 11:41 AM
Courtesy Copy of TRANSFER ORDER (TO-Dated 6/12/2015) transferring case to the Eastern District of Virginia re: MDL 2627 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Anthony J. Trenga. (Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair of the Panel). ** awaiting certified copy from the transferee court ** (gp)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 10, 2015
24 24 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 04/13 7:47 AM
ORDER granting23 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David Richardson Atkinson, Jr. and Nathan W Hill terminated. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 4/9/2015. (ls)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 08, 2015
23 23 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 04/08 4:11 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney For Defendants by David R. Atkinson and Nathan W. Hill. by LUMBER LIQUIDATORS HOLDINGS, INC., LUMBER LIQUIDATORS LEASING, LLC, LUMBER LIQUIDATORS SERVICES, LLC, LUMBER LIQUIDATORS, INC.. Responses due by 4/27/2015(Hill, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 07, 2015
22 22 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 04/07 6:37 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Eric Bilik on behalf of LUMBER LIQUIDATORS HOLDINGS, INC., LUMBER LIQUIDATORS LEASING, LLC, LUMBER LIQUIDATORS SERVICES, LLC, LUMBER LIQUIDATORS, INC.. Attorney Robert Eric Bilik added to party LUMBER LIQUIDATORS HOLDINGS, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Eric Bilik added to party LUMBER LIQUIDATORS LEASING, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Eric Bilik added to party LUMBER LIQUIDATORS SERVICES, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Eric Bilik added to party LUMBER LIQUIDATORS, INC.(pty:dft). (Bilik, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 06, 2015
21 21 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 04/06 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily Yandle Rottmann on behalf of LUMBER LIQUIDATORS HOLDINGS, INC., LUMBER LIQUIDATORS LEASING, LLC, LUMBER LIQUIDATORS SERVICES, LLC, LUMBER LIQUIDATORS, INC.. Attorney Emily Yandle Rottmann added to party LUMBER LIQUIDATORS HOLDINGS, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Yandle Rottmann added to party LUMBER LIQUIDATORS LEASING, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Yandle Rottmann added to party LUMBER LIQUIDATORS SERVICES, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Yandle Rottmann added to party LUMBER LIQUIDATORS, INC.(pty:dft). (Rottmann, Emily)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 25, 2015
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/25 2:56 PM
NOTICE by LUMBER LIQUIDATORS HOLDINGS, INC., LUMBER LIQUIDATORS LEASING, LLC, LUMBER LIQUIDATORS SERVICES, LLC, LUMBER LIQUIDATORS, INC. re18 Notice of Attorney Appearance,, Corrected Notice of Appearance of David R. Atkinson (Atkinson, David)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 03/25 9:48 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan W Hill on behalf of LUMBER LIQUIDATORS HOLDINGS, INC., LUMBER LIQUIDATORS LEASING, LLC, LUMBER LIQUIDATORS SERVICES, LLC, LUMBER LIQUIDATORS, INC.. Attorney Nathan W Hill added to party LUMBER LIQUIDATORS HOLDINGS, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Nathan W Hill added to party LUMBER LIQUIDATORS LEASING, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Nathan W Hill added to party LUMBER LIQUIDATORS SERVICES, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Nathan W Hill added to party LUMBER LIQUIDATORS, INC.(pty:dft). (Hill, Nathan)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 03/25 9:36 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Richardson Atkinson, Jr on behalf of LUMBER LIQUIDATORS HOLDINGS, INC., LUMBER LIQUIDATORS LEASING, LLC, LUMBER LIQUIDATORS SERVICES, LLC, LUMBER LIQUIDATORS, INC.. Attorney David Richardson Atkinson, Jr added to party LUMBER LIQUIDATORS HOLDINGS, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney David Richardson Atkinson, Jr added to party LUMBER LIQUIDATORS LEASING, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Richardson Atkinson, Jr added to party LUMBER LIQUIDATORS SERVICES, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Richardson Atkinson, Jr added to party LUMBER LIQUIDATORS, INC.(pty:dft). (Atkinson, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 16, 2015
17 17 order Order Staying Case Mon 03/16 11:57 AM
ORDER STAYING CASE Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 3/16/2015. (cbr)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Mon 03/16 11:58 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. per DE17 (cbr)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 13, 2015
16 16 misc Remark Fri 03/13 11:48 AM
Courtesy Copy of Notice of Motion and Motion for Consolidation and Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1407 filed Before The United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation.(gp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion,
Att: 2 Schedule of Actions,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, March 10, 2015
15 15 service Summons Issued Tue 03/10 2:49 PM
Summons Issued as to LUMBER LIQUIDATORS SERVICES, LLC. (asl)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Issued Tue 03/10 2:47 PM
Summons Issued as to LUMBER LIQUIDATORS HOLDINGS, INC. (asl)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Issued Tue 03/10 2:45 PM
Summons Issued as to LUMBER LIQUIDATORS LEASING, LLC. (asl)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Issued Tue 03/10 2:44 PM
Summons Issued as to LUMBER LIQUIDATORS, INC. (asl)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Tue 03/10 2:41 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re10 Summons Returned Unexecuted,9 Summons Returned Unexecuted,7 Summons Returned Unexecuted,8 Summons Returned Unexecuted. Wrong Event Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. It is not necessary to refile this document. (asl)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted Tue 03/10 12:29 PM
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted by JOAQUIN F BADIAS as to LUMBER LIQUIDATORS SERVICES, LLC. (Quaranta, John)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted Tue 03/10 12:29 PM
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted by JOAQUIN F BADIAS as to LUMBER LIQUIDATORS HOLDINGS, INC.. (Quaranta, John)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted Tue 03/10 12:28 PM
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted by JOAQUIN F BADIAS as to LUMBER LIQUIDATORS LEASING, LLC. (Quaranta, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted Tue 03/10 12:27 PM
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted by JOAQUIN F BADIAS as to LUMBER LIQUIDATORS, INC.. (Quaranta, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 05, 2015
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 03/05 6:19 PM
Corrected AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JOAQUIN F BADIAS.(Weil, Ronald)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 03/05 1:19 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JOAQUIN F BADIAS.(Weil, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 04, 2015
4 4 order Order Wed 03/04 1:08 PM
ORDER Requiring Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint due by 3/18/2015. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 3/4/2015. (ls)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 03, 2015
3 3 notice Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM Tue 03/03 4:37 PM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (vjk)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Judge Assignment Tue 03/03 4:36 PM
Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr (vjk)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/03 3:53 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-7522675, filed by JOAQUIN F BADIAS.(Quaranta, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet