California Central District Court
Judge:John F Walter
Referred: Paul L Abrams
Case #: 2:15-cv-01615
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2015
Terminated:Jun 16, 2015
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 01, 2015 5:59 AM PDT
Defendant
Lumber Liquidators, Inc.
Represented By
Lauren Lynn Wroblewski
Morrison And Foerster LLP
contact info
William L Stern
Morrison And Foerster LLP
contact info
William F Tarantino
Morrison And Foerster LLP
contact info
Lisa Ann Wongchenko
Morrison And Foerster LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
John Tyrrell
Represented By
Steve W Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Ari Brown
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Elaine T Byszewski
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tracie-Linn Tyrrell
Represented By
Steve W Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Ari Brown
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Elaine T Byszewski
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info


1. Class action lawsuit in California targets Lumber Liquidators (richmond.com)
Submitted Sat 03/07/2015
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, June 17, 2015
19 19 misc Receipt of Case by Other District (Electronic Case Transfer) Thu 06/18 9:28 AM
RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from California Central: case has been opened in Eastern District of Virginia - as case 1:15-cv-02634. (rn) Modified on 6/18/2015 (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 16, 2015
18 18 order Transferring Case Tue 06/16 4:49 PM
TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Mutidistrict Litigation MDL 2627. Case Extracted and Transferred via Electronically to USDC, Eastern District of Virginia at Norfolk and assigned to the Honorable Anthony J. Trenga for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 10, 2015
17 17 order Order Fri 04/10 4:42 PM
ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending MDL Consideration15 by Judge John F. Walter as follows: (1) This action is STAYED pending the transfer decision of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (the "MDL Panel") in In Re: Lumber Liquidators Chinese-Manufactured Flooring Products Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation (MDL No. 2627); (2) All deadlines, including Defendant's obligation to respond to Plaintiffs' complaint, are VACATED until further order of the Court; and (3) The parties shall notify the Court of the MDL Panels decision within10 days of the decision. (jp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 01, 2015
16 16 misc Declaration Wed 04/01 2:00 PM
DECLARATION of Lead Trial Counsel re Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Lumber Liquidators, Inc.. (Stern, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 27, 2015
15 15 stip Stay Case Fri 03/27 1:30 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending determination by the JPML whether this case should be transferred filed by Defendant Lumber Liquidators, Inc..(Stern, William)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 03/27 1:25 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lumber Liquidators, Inc., identifying Lumber Liquidators Holdings, Inc.. (Stern, William)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Appearance Fri 03/27 1:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney William L Stern on behalf of Defendant Lumber Liquidators, Inc. (Attorney William L Stern added to party Lumber Liquidators, Inc.(pty:dft))(Stern, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 16, 2015
12 12 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/16 11:13 AM
ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: granting11 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steve W. Berman on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Elaine T. Byszweski as local counsel. (lt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 12, 2015
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/12 12:54 PM
APPLICATION for attorney Steve W. Berman to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15359734 paid.) filed by Plaintiffs John Tyrrell, Tracie-Linn Tyrrell.(Byszewski, Elaine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 03/12 11:44 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff John Tyrrell, Tracie-Linn Tyrrell, upon Defendant Lumber Liquidators, Inc. served on 3/10/2015, answer due 3/31/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Co., Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Byszewski, Elaine)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 09, 2015
9 9 order Order Mon 03/09 2:42 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 05, 2015
8 8 misc Declaration Thu 03/05 6:28 PM
DECLARATION of John Tyrrell and Tracie-Linn Tyrrell re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 Regarding CLRA Venue filed by Plaintiffs John Tyrrell, Tracie-Linn Tyrrell. (Byszewski, Elaine)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/05 3:33 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Lumber Liquidators, Inc. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 03/05 3:06 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 03/05 3:05 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (car)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 03/05 1:39 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs John Tyrrell, Tracie-Linn Tyrrell, (Byszewski, Elaine)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Thu 03/05 1:38 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs John Tyrrell, Tracie-Linn Tyrrell. (Byszewski, Elaine)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 03/05 1:37 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs John Tyrrell, Tracie-Linn Tyrrell. (Byszewski, Elaine)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/05 1:36 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-15321224 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs John Tyrrell, Tracie-Linn Tyrrell. (Attorney Elaine T Byszewski added to party John Tyrrell(pty:pla), Attorney Elaine T Byszewski added to party Tracie-Linn Tyrrell(pty:pla))(Byszewski, Elaine)
Related: [-]