Gissendaner v. Bryson et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas W Thrash, Jr |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00689 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 10, 2015 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
1. | Legal Fight Reopens Over Woman's Execution in Georgia (wsj.com) |
Submitted Sat 03/14/2015 | |
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, October 28, 2015 | ||
52 | 52
![]() Certified copy of JUDGMENT of USCA AFFIRMING the decision of the District Court re:43 Notice of Appeal filed by Kelly Renee Gissendaner. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 15-14335 P. (pjm) |